YOUNG v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: DR. S. STANLEY YOUNG, S. STANLEY YOUNG and LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR.
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ALISON C. CULLEN, CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE and ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD
Case Number: 1:2021cv02623
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-5305 for #43 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by S. STANLEY YOUNG, LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR.. (zjm)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re #43 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #42 Order on Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, Order on Motion to Stay, #38 Memorandum & Opinion, #37 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Set/Reset Deadlines by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-9683240. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Shumate, Brett)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment and Stay of Proceedings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/2/2022. (lctjk3)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE re #40 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment (Partial) MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Robinson, John)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #39 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' #40 Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment by November 7, 2022. If Defendants oppose the motion, it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any reply by November 14, 2022. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' obligation to answer Plaintiffs' complaint is stayed until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/24/2022. (lctjk3)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment (Partial), MOTION to Stay Proceedings by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Shumate, Brett)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #37 Order denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting Defendants' #20 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/30/2022. (lctjk3)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting Defendants' #20 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/30/2022. (lctjk3)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of EPA's Transmission of Proposed Rule to White House Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 12-22-21; Page Numbers: 1-68; Date of Issuance: 5-5-22; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter refer enced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/26/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2022.(Miller, Timothy)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Final CASAC Reports by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of CASAC Meeting and Vote by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shumate, Brett)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #31 Order denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/16/2022. (lctjk3) (Main Document 32 replaced to correct typo on 2/18/2022) (zkh).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/16/2022. (lctjk3)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Draft CASAC Meeting Agenda and Draft Reports by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(Shumate, Brett)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Scheduled Meetings of the Clean Air Scientific Advisory Committee by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Federal Register Notice)(Robinson, John)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: VTC Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 12/22/2021. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT APPENDIX by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Shumate, Brett)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Joint Motion for Privacy Act Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/6/2021. (lctjk3)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Order under Privacy Act by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Expedited Partial Summary Judgement on December 22, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. via videoconference and shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at least one business day prior to the hearing to make arrangements to participate. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/3/2021. (lctjk3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , or in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Robinson, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE re #20 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Shumate, Brett)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , or in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) filed by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Shumate, Brett)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of filing of index to the administrative record by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index of Administrative Record)(Robinson, John)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Thomas H. Brennan, #3 Declaration of Dr. Elizabeth Anne Sheppard, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , or in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) filed by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas H. Brennan, #2 Declaration of Dr. Elizabeth Anne Sheppard, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/7/2021, (ztth)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Redline Comparison)(Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD served on 10/15/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE served on 10/18/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALISON C. CULLEN served on 10/18/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD served on 10/18/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL S. REGAN served on 10/15/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 10/18/2021 (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2021. (Shumate, Brett)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/8/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/7/2021. (Shumate, Brett); Modified service date and answer deadline on 10/29/2021 (ztth).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , or in the alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) by S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Louis Anthony "Tony" Cox, Jr., #3 Declaration of James E. Enstrom, #4 Declaration of Dennis Paustenbach, #5 Declaration of S. Stanley Young (with Exhibits), #6 Declaration of Brett A. Shumate, #7 Exhibit A to Shumate Decl., #8 Exhibit B to Shumate Decl., #9 Exhibit C to Shumate Decl., #10 Exhibit D to Shumate Decl., #11 Exhibit E to Shumate Decl., #12 Exhibit F to Shumate Decl., #13 Exhibit G to Shumate Decl., #14 Exhibit H to Shumate Decl., #15 Exhibit I to Shumate Decl., #16 Exhibit J to Shumate Decl., #17 Exhibit K to Shumate Decl., #18 Exhibit L to Shumate Decl., #19 Exhibit M to Shumate Decl., #20 Exhibit N to Shumate Decl., #21 Exhibit O to Shumate Decl., #22 Exhibit P to Shumate Decl., #23 Exhibit Q to Shumate Decl., #24 Exhibit R to Shumate Decl., #25 Exhibit S to Shumate Decl., #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 10/22/2021. Response, Cross Motion and Administrative Record due by 11/5/2021. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 11/15/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/24/2021. (zkh)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #6 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary injunction or, in the alternative, a motion for expedited partial summary judgment on Counts V through VIII by October 22, 2021; Defendants shall file their combined opposition to Plaintiff's motion and cross-motion for partial summary judgment as well as supply the administrative record to Plaintiff by November 5, 2021; Plaintiff shall submit its combined reply to Defendants' opposition and opposition to Defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment by November 15, 2021; Defendants shall submit their reply in support of their cross-motion for partial summary judgment by November 24, 2021. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' obligation to answer Plaintiff's complaint is stayed until 30 days after the resolution of the motion for preliminary injunction and/or cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/19/2021. (lctjk3)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Kenny on behalf of S. STANLEY YOUNG (Kenny, Stephen)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/08/2021. (lctjk3)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Patrick Falvey on behalf of S. STANLEY YOUNG (Falvey, Joseph)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8786313) filed by S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons (EPA), #10 Summons (Regan), #11 Summons (SAB), #12 Summons (Cullen), #13 Summons (CASAC), #14 Summons (Sheppard))(Shumate, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. S. STANLEY YOUNG
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Falvey
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. STANLEY YOUNG
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Falvey
Represented By: Stephen J. Kenny
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR.
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL S. REGAN
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISON C. CULLEN
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?