SALINE PARENTS et al v. GARLAND
Plaintiff: SALINE PARENTS, RAELYN DAVIS, XI VAN FLEET, JOSEPH CAREY MOBLEY, MICHAEL RIVERA and SHAWNTEL COOPER
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND and MERRICK B. GARLAND
Case Number: 1:2021cv02775
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/1/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/31/2021.) (Muise, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 20, 2021. (lcdlf3)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Eliezer Yerushalmi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Yerushalmi, David)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK GARLAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8808690) filed by SHAWNTEL COOPER, SALINE PARENTS, JOSEPH CAREY MOBLEY, XI VAN FLEET, RAELYN DAVIS, MICHAEL RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Muise, Robert)
October 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALINE PARENTS et al v. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALINE PARENTS
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAELYN DAVIS
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XI VAN FLEET
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CAREY MOBLEY
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RIVERA
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWNTEL COOPER
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?