COLLIER v. KENDALL
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE COLLIER
Defendant: FRANK KENDALL
Case Number: 1:2021cv02781
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 1/3/2022. (ztg)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendant's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Secretary shall file his response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before January 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/1/21. (lctnm1)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FRANK KENDALL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman, II on behalf of FRANK KENDALL (Tilghman, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number: ADCDC-8824535. (eg)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Redacted Complaint to #4 Sealed Document by DOMINIQUE COLLIER. (Montalvo, Eric)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FRANK KENDALL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED COMPLAINT filed by DOMINIQUE COLLIER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(zeg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting in part #1 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/19/2021. (eg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED ORDER re #1 SEALED MOTION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.).(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/19/2021.(eg)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 SEALED MOTION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLIER v. KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE COLLIER
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK KENDALL
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?