JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02824
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Production of the non-exempt portions of any responsive records due by 2/11/2022; Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2022; summary judgment motions due by 3/31/2022; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 5/2/2022; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 6/1/2022; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 6/15/2022. (ztg)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' #9 Meet and Confer Statement, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to govern proceedings in this matter: (1) by February 11, 2022, defendant shall complete production of the non-exempt portions of any responsive records; (2) by February 25, 2022, parties shall file a Joint Status Report identifying any disputed issues; (3) by March 31, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (4) by May 2, 2022, plaintiff shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment; (5) by June 1, 2022, defendant shall file any opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (6) by June 15, 2022, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 20, 2021. (lcbah4)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Snyder, Hilarie)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Snyder, Hilarie)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 26, 2021. (lcbah4)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
October 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8821024) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, #3 Summons for US Attorney General, #4 Summons for U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: James F. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Hilarie Elise Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?