LIRIANO v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: YONY LIRIANO
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RAISER, LLC and AHMAD FARZAD TAHERI
Case Number: 1:2021cv02836
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2022. Discovery due by 5/16/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/6/2022. Initial Disclosure due by 1/5/2022. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 3/28/2022; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 4/28/2022; Reply, if any, due by 5/5/2022. Status Conference set for 5/23/2022 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 30, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 26, 2021 Filing 15 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Brooks-Rodney, Kim)
November 26, 2021 Filing 14 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Brooks-Rodney, Kim)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Receipt on 11/8/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 003482 V. (znmw)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 5, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #11 Response to the Court's October 28, 2021 Minute Order. Having concluded that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case, an Initial Scheduling Order will follow. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 5, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 5, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,, filed by RAISER, LLC. (Szego, Dov)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by RAISER, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Szego, Dov)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RAISER, LLC (Szego, Dov)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Szego, Dov)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Szego, Dov)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Hanrahan on behalf of RAISER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Hanrahan, Catherine)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dov Szego on behalf of RAISER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Szego, Dov)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTALISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/01/2021. (DM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by AHMAD FARZAD TAHERI.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Defendants' #1 Notice of Removal. Therein, Defendants base this Court's removal jurisdiction solely on the existence of diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Such diversity jurisdiction, however, requires complete diversity of citizenship between each of the Defendants and the Plaintiff. Of particular note, Defendant Raiser, LLC is a limited liability company. See Not. of Removal at Par. 6. And for the purposes of diversity jurisdiction, "[l]imited liability companies... carry the citizenship of each of their members." Simon v. Hofgard, 172 F.Supp.3d 308, 314-15 (D.D.C. 2016). Defendants, however, have not made clear what members Raiser, LLC has and what effect these LLC members have on the citizenship-status of Raiser, LLC. Accordingly, by or before NOVEMBER 12, 2021, Defendants must show cause that diversity jurisdiction exists in this case, notwithstanding Raiser, LLC's status as a limited liability company. Specifically, Defendants must identify the complete citizenship status of Raiser, LLC, based on each of its members, and demonstrate that such citizenship does not defeat diversity jurisdiction in this case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 28, 2021. (lcckk1)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (adh, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 003482 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8824185 filed by AHMAD FARZAD TAHERI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service Taheri, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service Rasier, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service Uber, #6 Exhibit E-Answer Rasier, #7 Exhibit F-Answer Uber, #8 Exhibit G-Superior Court Notice of Removal)(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIRIANO v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YONY LIRIANO
Represented By: Kim D. Brooks-Rodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer H Fitzgerald
Represented By: Catherine A. Hanrahan
Represented By: Dov Szego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAISER, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer H Fitzgerald
Represented By: Catherine A. Hanrahan
Represented By: Dov Szego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAD FARZAD TAHERI
Represented By: Jennifer H Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?