NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02857
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/7/2022. (nbn)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 7, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/6/2021. (lcjeb2)
December 5, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas)
December 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of All Defendants (Quinn, Thomas)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/1/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/1/2021. (See Docket Entry #6 to view document). (znmw)
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Hilary)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (ztth)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Summons to Issue by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Jacobs, Hilary); Modified docketing event and text on 10/29/2021 (ztth).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-529. (Jacobs, Hilary) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/1/2021) (znmw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8828501) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Jacobs, Hilary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Represented By: Hilary Jacobs
Represented By: John Stephen Guttmann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?