GHEBREYESUS et al v. FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA et al
Plaintiff: SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES, FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS and SIMRET ZEREYOHANS KELEB
Defendant: BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, BIRUK BEKELE BESHAH, BIRUK BEKELE and BROOK BEKELE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02865
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1602
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Szymkowicz, John)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Szymkowicz on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Szymkowicz, John)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CITY OF ADDIS ABABA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA served on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kim, Hwan)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Defendants, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 Waybill) (zjf)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entry #7 to view document) (zjf)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby grants the #10 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading, and sets the following deadlines as to defendant Brook Bekele Beshah. Defendant Bekele shall file his motion to dismiss the complaint on or before December 23, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file shall file their opposition on or before January 24, 2022. Defendant Bekele shall file his reply on or before February 4, 2022. Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or Motion to Dismiss due by 12/23/2021. Opposition due by 1/24/2022. Reply due by 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2021. (lccrc3)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by BROOK BEKELE BESHAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Szymkowicz, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Szymkowicz on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Szymkowicz, John)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Alan Bikoff on behalf of BROOK BEKELE BESHAH (Bikoff, Russell)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Hwan)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BROOK BEKELE BESHAH served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Hwan)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Angelo Bartolanzo on behalf of FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartolanzo, Adam)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A.F. Popovic on behalf of FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Popovic, Neil)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil A.F. Popovic. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/2/2021. (lccrc3)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8830508. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Neil A.F. Popovic, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROOK BEKELE BESHAH, CITY OF ADDIS ABABA, FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA, FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA, SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-8830436) filed by FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS, SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Summons for Federal Democratic Republic of Ethiopia, #12 Summons Summons for Ministry of Foreign Affairs of Ethiopia, #13 Summons Summons for City of Addis Ababa, #14 Summons Summons for Sub-City of Bole, Addis Ababa, #15 Summons Summons for Federal First Instance Court of Ethiopia, #16 Summons Summons for Brook Bekele Beshah)(Kim, Hwan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GHEBREYESUS et al v. FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMRET ZERAI YOHANNES
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREMICHAEL GHEBREYESUS
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMRET ZEREYOHANS KELEB
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Adam Angelo Bartolanzo
Represented By: Neil A.F. Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOK BEKELE BESHAH
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF ETHIOPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ADDIS ABABA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUB-CITY OF BOLE, ADDIS ABABA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL FIRST INSTANCE COURT OF ETHIOPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRUK BEKELE BESHAH
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRUK BEKELE
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOK BEKELE
Represented By: John Paul Szymkowicz
Represented By: Russell Alan Bikoff
Represented By: John T. Szymkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?