US INVENTOR, INC. v. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Plaintiff: US INVENTOR, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02894
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William W. Flachsbart is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/7/21. (DJS)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE served on 11/5/2021 (Medich, Brian)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA Signed Declaration by US INVENTOR, INC. re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William W. Flachsbart, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8842848. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Medich, Brian)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
November 4, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to bmedich@dbllawyers.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Declaration must have an original, wet signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
November 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William W. Flachsbart, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8842848. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Medich, Brian)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8840211) filed by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Medich, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US INVENTOR, INC. v. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US INVENTOR, INC.
Represented By: Brian Medich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?