BRIDWELL et al v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GRACE BRIDWELL, PHILIP COOPER and PHILLIP COOPER
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC and ERIC WILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02943
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigitte Joelle Smith on behalf of RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Smith, Brigitte)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for January 27, 2022 at 11:00 AM via VTC before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Video connection information will be emailed to the parties separately. Joint Proposed Discovery Plan due by January 20, 2022. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/6/2021. (lccrc1)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Grace, Kathryn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER, LLC (Grace, Kathryn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RASIER, LLC.(Grace, Kathryn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Grace, Kathryn)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt on 11/18/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 003620 V. (zjf)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ERIC WILLIAMS.(Callahan, Caroline)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal filed by ERIC WILLIAMS. (Callahan, Caroline) Modified event title on 11/15/2021 (znmw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Scialpi on behalf of GRACE BRIDWELL, PHILLIP COOPER (Scialpi, Daniel)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
November 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA re Civil Cover Sheet by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Grace, Kathryn)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA re Notice of Removal by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Grace, Kathryn)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to kathryn.grace@wilsonelser.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 003620 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8853226 filed by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Grace, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIDWELL et al v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE BRIDWELL
Represented By: Daniel C. Scialpi
Represented By: Patrick A. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP COOPER
Represented By: Daniel C. Scialpi
Represented By: Patrick A. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC WILLIAMS
Represented By: Caroline L. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?