CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY v. CENSUS BUREAU et al
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY
Defendant: CENSUS BUREAU, THE, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, THE, GINA RAIMONDO, RON JARMIN, CENSUS BUREAU and DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03045
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Referring Judge: Florence Y Pan
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A: Census Bureau, Population of the U.S., Table 1 (June 1, 1870), #4 Exhibit B: Census Office Superintendent Francis A. Walker, Report of the Superintendent of the Ninth Census (Nov. 21, 1871), #5 Exhibit C: Ayush Sharma Declaration, #6 Exhibit (C) 1: Census Bureau, Table 1, Apportionment Population and Number of Representatives by State: 2020 Census., #7 Exhibit (C) 2: Census Bureau, Priority Values for 2020 Census Apportionment, #8 Exhibit (C) 3: Census Bureau, Table 4a, Reported Voting and Registration for States: November 2020, #9 Exhibit (C) 4: Census Bureau, Current Population Survey, November 2020, Voting and Registration Supplement, Technical Documentation, #10 (C) 5: Sentencing Project, Locked Out 2020: Estimates of People Denied Voting Rights Due to a Felony Conviction (Oct. 15, 2020, updated Oct. 30, 2020), #11 Exhibit (C) 6: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 1 priority values based on the basis-of-representation and compared to the Census Bureaus priority values from Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit (C) 7: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 2 basis-of-representation value calculations, #13 Exhibit (C) 8: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 2 priority values based on the basis-of-representation, #14 Exhibit (C) 9: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 3 basis-of-representation value calculations, #15 Exhibit (C) 10: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 3 priority values based on the basis-of-representation, #16 Exhibit (C) 11: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 5 priority values based on the basis-of-representation, #17 Exhibit (C) 12: Election Data Services, Final Census Apportionment Counts Surprises Many Observers; Raising Questions of Why? (Apr. 28, 2021), #18 Exhibit (C) 13: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 4 basis-of-representation value calculations, #19 Exhibit (C) 14: Ayush Sharma, Scenario 4 priority values based on the basis-of-representation, #20 Exhibit D: Census Bureau, Press Release, 2020 Presidential Election Voting and Registration Tables Now Available (Apr. 29, 2021), #21 Exhibit E: Census Bureau, Press Release, U.S. Census Bureau Today Delivers State Population Totals for Congressional Apportionment (Apr. 26, 2021), #22 Exhibit F: Sarah Banks Declaration, #23 Exhibit G: Androniki Lagos Declaration, #24 Exhibit H: Isabel Magnus Declaration, #25 Exhibit I: Michael Carr Declaration, #26 Exhibit J: U.S. Commn on Civil Rights, Political Participation (1968), #27 Exhibit K: NOAH WEBSTER ET AL., AM. DICTIONARY OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE 6 (Springfield, Mass. G. & C. Merriam 1865))(Pettinato, Jared)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 USCA ORDER filed in USCA on December 16, 2021 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT; designating Circuit Judge Justin R. Walker and Judge Florence Y. Pan to hear and determine this case. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (ztnr)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's #4 Motion for a three-judge panel under 28 U.S.C. 2284(a) and the Government's #12 Response, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. As required under 28 U.S.C. 2284(b)(1), the Clerk of Court shall, on behalf of this Court, notify the Chief Judge of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia for assignment of this matter to a three-judge district court. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 13, 2021. (lccjn2)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court filed by CENSUS BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, RON JARMIN, GINA RAIMONDO. (Sverdlov, Alexander)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Ehrlich on behalf of All Defendants (Ehrlich, Stephen)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V. Sverdlov on behalf of All Defendants (Sverdlov, Alexander)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RON JARMIN served on 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Acting Census Bureau Director Ron Jarmin Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Acting Census Bureau Director Ron Jarmin Certified Mail Tracking, #3 Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Attorney General Certified Mail Tracking, #5 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt, #6 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Tracking)(Pettinato, Jared) Modified serve date on 12/6/2021 (zeg).
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GINA RAIMONDO served on 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Secretary of Commerce Gina Raimondo Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Secretary of Commerce Gina Raimondo Certified Mail Tracking, #3 Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Attorney General Certified Mail Tracking, #5 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt, #6 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Tracking)(Pettinato, Jared) Modified serve date on 12/6/2021 (zeg).
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Department of Commerce Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Department of Commerce Certified Mail Tracking, #3 Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Attorney General Certified Mail Tracking, #5 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt, #6 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Tracking)(Pettinato, Jared) Modified serve date on 12/6/2021 (zeg).
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENSUS BUREAU served on 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Census Bureau Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Census Bureau Certified Mail Tracking, #3 Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Attorney General Certified Mail Tracking, #5 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt, #6 U.S. Attorney Certified Mail Tracking)(Pettinato, Jared) Modified serve date on 12/6/2021 (zeg).
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY re #4 Civil Statement, #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests . (Pettinato, Jared)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Statement Plaintiffs Application for a Three-Judge Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support from Plaintiffs. (Pettinato, Jared)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENSUS BUREAU, THE, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, THE, RON JARMIN, GINA RAIMONDO. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY (Pettinato, Jared)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENSUS BUREAU, THE, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, THE, RON JARMIN, GINA RAIMONDO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8871861) filed by CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. 1: Letter from Ron S. Jarmin, Acting Director of the Census Bureau, to Jared Pettinato, The Pettinato Firm (Oct. 1, 2021), #3 Summons to the Census Bureau, #4 Summons to the Department of Commerce, #5 Summons to Secretary of Commerce Gina Raimondo, #6 Summons to Acting Census Bureau Director Ron Jarmin)(Pettinato, Jared) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/17/2021) (adh, ).
November 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY v. CENSUS BUREAU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEGRITY
Represented By: Jared Pettinato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENSUS BUREAU, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA RAIMONDO
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON JARMIN
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENSUS BUREAU
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?