FUENTES v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS FUENTES
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR., MERRICK GARLAND, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, ANTONY BLINKEN, LOUIS DEJOY, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DAVID P. PEKOSKE and STEVE DICKSON
Case Number: 1:2021cv03106
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #5 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney; emailed to npattis@pattisandsmith.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Please refile selecting all defendants who were served. (zeg, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2022. (Pattis, Norman)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ANTONY BLINKEN, LOUIS DEJOY, STEVE DICKSON, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DAVID P. PEKOSKE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET Pursuant to November 24, 2021 Notice From The Court by NICHOLAS FUENTES re Notice of QC- New Case,, #1 Complaint, filed by NICHOLAS FUENTES. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,, #1 Complaint, filed by NICHOLAS FUENTES.(Pattis, Norman)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA Correcting Caption Pursuant to November 24, 2021 Notice From Court by NICHOLAS FUENTES re #1 Complaint, filed by NICHOLAS FUENTES. (Pattis, Norman)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to npattis@pattisandsmith.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8887683) filed by NICHOLAS FUENTES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2, #4 Summons 3, #5 Summons 4, #6 Summons 5, #7 Summons 6, #8 Summons 7, #9 Summons 8, #10 Summons 9, #11 10)(Pattis, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUENTES v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS FUENTES
Represented By: Norman A Pattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONY BLINKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID P. PEKOSKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE DICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?