HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE et al v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE, MIRARD JOSEPH, MADELEINE PROSPERE, MAYCO CELON, VERONIQUE CASSONELL, WILSON DOE, JACQUES DOE, ESTHER DOE, EMMANUEL DOE, SAMUEL DOE, SAMENTHA DOE and PAUL DOE
Defendant: JOSEPH BIDEN, ALEJANDRO J. MAYORKAS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHRIS MAGNUS, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, RAUL ORTIZ, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, TAE D. JOHNSON, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY and CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Case Number: 1:2021cv03317
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/14/22. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Manning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manning, Stephen)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED Declaration re #1 Complaint,, filed by MADELEINE PROSPERE, PAUL DOE, HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE, JACQUES DOE, EMMANUEL DOE, SAMUEL DOE, WILSON DOE, ESTHER DOE, MIRARD JOSEPH, MAYCO CELON, VERONIQUE CASSONELL, SAMENTHA DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 sealed motion for leave to file document under seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/4/2022. (lcegs3)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to VERONIQUE CASSONELL, MAYCO CELON, EMMANUEL DOE, ESTHER DOE, JACQUES DOE, PAUL DOE, SAMENTHA DOE, SAMUEL DOE, WILSON DOE, HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE, MIRARD JOSEPH, MADELEINE PROSPERE. Attorney Daniel J. Tully terminated. (Tully, Daniel)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 1/11/2022; JOSEPH BIDEN served on 1/14/2022; CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 1/13/2022; WILLIAM A. FERRARA served on 1/10/2022; TAE D. JOHNSON served on 1/10/2022; CHRIS MAGNUS served on 1/10/2022; ALEJANDRO J. MAYORKAS served on 1/10/2022; RAUL ORTIZ served on 1/10/2022; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 1/10/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/11/2022; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 1/10/2022; ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY served on 1/10/2022 (Tumlin, Karen)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/13/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2022. (Tumlin, Karen)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Wilfong on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilfong, Lauren)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znmg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by VERONIQUE CASSONELL, MAYCO CELON, EMMANUEL DOE, ESTHER DOE, JACQUES DOE, PAUL DOE, SAMENTHA DOE, SAMUEL DOE, WILSON DOE, HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE, MIRARD JOSEPH, MADELEINE PROSPERE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen C. Tumlin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tumlin, Karen)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 23, 2021. (lcbah4)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by EMMANUEL DOE, ESTHER DOE, JACQUES DOE, PAUL DOE, SAMENTHA DOE, SAMUEL DOE, WILSON DOE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Emmanuel, #4 Declaration Esther, #5 Declaration Jacques, #6 Declaration Paul, #7 Declaration Samentha, #8 Declaration Samuel, #9 Declaration Wilson)(Tumlin, Karen)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to karen.tumlin@justiceactioncenter.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Pseudonym Request e-filed without leave of court. Please submit motion using the event Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-02245-EGS-GMH; 1:21-cv-00100-EGS. (zsb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Petersen Bentrott on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bentrott, Jane)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther H. Sung on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sung, Esther)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Tully on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tully, Daniel)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tess Hellgren on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hellgren, Tess)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C. Tumlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tumlin, Karen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8941164) filed by SAMENTHA DOE, JACQUES DOE, MIRARD JOSEPH, HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE, WILSON DOE, MADELEINE PROSPERE, EMMANUEL DOE, PAUL DOE, ESTHER DOE, MAYCO CELON, SAMUEL DOE, VERONIQUE CASSONELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Related Case Form, #3 Summons Becerra, #4 Summons Biden, #5 Summons CBP, #6 Summons CDC, #7 Summons DHS, #8 Summons Ferrara, #9 Summons HHS, #10 Summons ICE, #11 Summons Johnson, #12 Summons Magnus, #13 Summons Mayorkas, #14 Summons Ortiz, #15 Summons Walensky, #16 Summons Graves)(Tumlin, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE et al v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAITIAN BRIDGE ALLIANCE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRARD JOSEPH
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADELEINE PROSPERE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYCO CELON
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONIQUE CASSONELL
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILSON DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUES DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMENTHA DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL DOE
Represented By: Daniel J. Tully
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Jane Petersen Bentrott
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Lauren Wilfong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO J. MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS MAGNUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM A. FERRARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAUL ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAE D. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?