COULON et al v. RASIER LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Coulon and Courtney Coulon
Defendant: Rasier LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Abu Godo, Brittany Brunson, Rosa Trapp-Dail, JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC. and IZAIAH MCNEIL
Case Number: 1:2022cv00530
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRITTANY BRUNSON, ABU GODO, IZAIAH MCNEIL, RASIER LLC, ROSA TRAPP-DAIL, JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC. with Jury Demand filed by ASHLEY COULON, COURTNEY COULON.(Lee, Joanne)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On April 7, 2022, the court vacated the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for April 8, 2022, so that Plaintiffs could file an amended complaint to add an additional defendant. Minute Order, April 7, 2022; see Pl.'s Partial Consent Mot. to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference, ECF No. 12. Plaintiffs have not yet filed their amended complaint. They shall do so by April 29, 2022. If they do not file their amended complaint by that date, the court will proceed with an Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/22/2022. (lcapm2)
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRITTANY BRUNSON (Rafey, Judd)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BRITTANY BRUNSON.(Rafey, Judd)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #12 Partial Consent Motion to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for April 8, 2022, is hereby vacated and will be rescheduled to a date after Plaintiffs have filed their amended complaint. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/7/2022. (lcapm2)
April 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Saltzman on behalf of RASIER LLC (Saltzman, Jonathan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference Consent filed by ROSA TRAPP-DAIL. (Gupta, Roopal)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Trapp-Dail shall respond to #12 Plaintiff's Partial Consent Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by April 6, 2022. Plaintiffs shall continue to make efforts to ascertain the positions of the pro se Defendants and shall notify the court as to their positions, if obtained, by April 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/4/2022. (lcapm2)
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference by ASHLEY COULON, COURTNEY COULON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joanne)
April 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Roopal Gupta on behalf of ROSA TRAPP-DAIL (Gupta, Roopal)
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by ABU GODO, HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC (Giroux, Danielle)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle D. Giroux on behalf of ABU GODO, HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC (Giroux, Danielle)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/21/2022 (Lee, Joanne)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for April 8, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/7/2022. (lcapm2)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER LLC (Smith, Brigitte)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by RASIER LLC.(Smith, Brigitte)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 Receipt on 3/4/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 000031 V. (zeg)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
March 3, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rasier LLC filed by Rasier LLC.(Smith, Brigitte)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 000031 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9070396 filed by Rasier LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Smith, Brigitte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COULON et al v. RASIER LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Coulon
Represented By: Joanne J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Coulon
Represented By: Joanne J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmsman Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Danielle D. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Godo
Represented By: Danielle D. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Brunson
Represented By: Judd Alan Rafey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Trapp-Dail
Represented By: Roopal Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IZAIAH MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?