TALBOT v. BOWSER et al
Plaintiff: KATHERINE TALBOT
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, MURIEL BOWSER, DC HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT and JOHN DOES 1-20
Case Number: 1:2022cv00595
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Religion
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Dismissal with Prejudice by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Kraft, Theresa)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #12 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/15/22.
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Kraft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraft, Theresa)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 44.5(a). Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/22. (lctnm2)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Vacate Emergency Hearing by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Toikka, Richard) Modified event on 3/10/2022 (znmw).
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Notice (Other) filed by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Toikka, Richard)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Vacate. The Court hereby VACATES the hearing previously scheduled for March 7, 2022. The Court also denies as moot Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/7/22. (lctnm2)
March 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Mootness by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Coughlin, Charles)
March 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Joseph Coughlin on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Coughlin, Charles)
March 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court directs Plaintiff to respond by 12:00 p.m. on March 7, 2022 to Defendants' #8 Notice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/6/22. (lctnm2)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 ERRATA by KATHERINE TALBOT re #1 Complaint filed by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata, #3 Summons)(Toikka, Richard)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DC HEALTH, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, LAQUANDRA NESBITT and District of Columbia Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/22. (lctnm2)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Theresa Dawn Truitt Kraft, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9081048. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toikka, Richard)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 Exparte, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Toikka, Richard)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9080745) filed by KATHERINE TALBOT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Toikka, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2022) (znmw).
March 4, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 2- In Person before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
March 4, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet; emailed to rst@toikkalawgroup.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. The civil cover sheet should be filed in a non-fillable PDF format. After completing the form, you will need to print to PDF. Please file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
March 4, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's request, found in her #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, for ex parte consideration of that Motion. The Court directs Plaintiff to serve the Defendants forthwith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/22. (lctnm2)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's prior Minute Order denying the request for ex parte consideration of Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, the Court directs the Clerk to place that #2 Motion on the public case docket. The Court also directs the parties to appear for a Motion Hearing on the #2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on March 7, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/22. (lctnm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALBOT v. BOWSER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE TALBOT
Represented By: Richard S. Toikka
Represented By: Theresa Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Charles Joseph Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAQUANDRA NESBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?