REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE v. PELOSI et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Defendant: NANCY PELOSI, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM B. SCHIFF, JAMIE B. RASKIN, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, PETER R. AGUILAR, STEPHANIE MURPHY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SELELCT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL and SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
Amicus Curiae: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00659
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Memorandum in opposition to re #36 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the RNC shall file its reply, if any, to its #36 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by May 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/06/2022. (lctjk2)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re #35 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ERRATA by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE re #36 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' CORRECTED Memorandum in Support of Motioon for Injunction Pending Appeal)(Murray, Christopher)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Christopher)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #33 Memorandum & Opinion, #32 Order by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-9215071. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Murray, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Clarify re #32 Order dismissing in part Plaintiff's amended complaint and entering judgment against Plaintiff by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Murray, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the RNC's unopposed #34 Motion for Clarification of the Court's May 1, 2022 Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the RNC's unopposed #34 Motion is GRANTED. Upon review of the #34 Motion, the Court informs the parties that it did not intend to either suggest or foreclose any course of action for the RNC. By May 4, 2022, the RNC may seek an injunction pending appeal in any manner it so chooses, subject to the requirements of whatever rule it invokes to seek such relief. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/03/2022. (lctjk2)
May 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #32 Order dismissing in part Plaintiff's amended complaint and entering judgment against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/01/2022. (lctjk2)
May 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing in part Plaintiff's amended complaint and entering judgment against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/01/2022. (lctjk2)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for House Defendants and Salesforce shall confer with their clients about whether House Defendants are willing to withhold enforcing the subpoena, and Salesforce is willing to withhold compliance, for one additional business day--until May 2--to facilitate the Court's resolution of this matter. If either House Defendants or Salesforce do not so agree, that party shall file a notice on the docket before 2:00 p.m. today. If neither party files such a notice, the Court will interpret that as their agreement to withhold enforcing and complying with the subpoena until May 2. The Court is appreciative of the patience of the parties. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/28/2022. (lctjk2)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for House Defendants and Salesforce shall confer with their clients about whether House Defendants are willing to withhold enforcing the subpoena, and Salesforce is willing to withhold compliance, for two additional days, or until April 29, to facilitate the Court's resolution of this matter. If either House Defendants or Salesforce do not so agree, that party shall file a notice on the docket before 5:00 p.m. today. If neither party files such a notice, the Court will interpret that as their agreement to withhold enforcing and complying with the subpoena until April 29. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/25/2022. (lctjk2)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: VTC Status Conference held on 4/22/2022. (Court Reporter: Timthy Miller) (zkh)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear via video teleconference on April 22, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. for a status conference. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/21/2022. (lctjk2)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE re #30 Notice (Other), Regarding April 18, 2022 Status Confernece filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Murray, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE Regarding April 18, 2022 Status Conference by PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON (Letter, Douglas)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: VTC Status Conference held on 4/18/2022. Defense submission due by 4/19/2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, due by 4/20/2022. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear via video teleconference today, April 18, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. for a status conference. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/18/2022. (lctjk2)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Murray, Christopher)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re #27 Supplemental Memorandum filed by PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Letter, Douglas) Modified event title on 4/15/2022 (znmw).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of April 1, 2022 Hearing)(Murray, Christopher)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #23 Order, Set Deadlines filed by PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Letter, Douglas)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #23 Order, Set Deadlines filed by SALESFORCE.COM, INC.. (Zwillinger, Marc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 04/01/2022. Page Numbers: 1-136. Date of Issuance: 04/05/2022. Stenographic Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer. Telephone Number: 202-354-3118. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/05/2022. (lctjk2)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2022, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral arguments heard and motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer) (zgdf)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Randal Columbus on behalf of PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON (Columbus, Eric)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of C. Schaeffer in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Murray, Christopher)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Attorney Julian Ellis terminated. (Ellis, Julian)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher O. Murray (Murray, Christopher)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMICUS BRIEF by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (ztth)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion of National Republican Senatorial Committee for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that the unopposed #16 Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket ECF No. 16-1. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/24/2022. (lctjk2)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Letter, Douglas)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Order for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Spies, Charles)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SALESFORCE.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sommer, Jacob)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SALESFORCE.COM, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztth)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 3/16/2022 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. modification of motions deadline discussed. Minute order issued outlining new dates. Court Reporter Jeff Hooks. (zjch, )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Murray, Christopher)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Ellis on behalf of REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Ellis, Julian)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Alan Sommer on behalf of SALESFORCE.COM, INC. (Sommer, Jacob)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Zwillinger on behalf of SALESFORCE.COM, INC. (Zwillinger, Marc)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON (Letter, Douglas)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Julian R. Ellis, Jr., is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff Republican National Committee. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/16/2022. (lctjk2)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear today, March 16, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. for a telephonic status conference. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3387 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/16/2022. (lctjk2)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons discussed during the status conference today, March 16, 2022, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings on Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: the House of Representatives Defendants shall file their opposition brief and Safesforce.com shall file its responsive brief (if any) by March 23, 2022; Plaintiff shall file its reply by March 29, 2022; and the parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on April 1, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/16/2022. (lctjk2)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support and Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of C. Schaeffer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Schaeffer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of J. Riemer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of C. Murray in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Christopher)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Salesforce.com, Inc. re #6 Amended Complaint, filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Related document: #6 Amended Complaint, filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE.(Murray, Christopher)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, SALESFORCE.COM, INC. filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B- Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Murray, Christopher)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julian R. Ellis, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9105079. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Julian R. Ellis, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Christopher)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (13) Issued Electronically as to PETER R. AGUILAR, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM B. SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2022) (ztth).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 03/11/2022. (lctjk2)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to the U.S. Attorney General and the U. S. Attorney re #1 Complaint,, filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Summons U. S. Attorney)(Murray, Christopher)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmh)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to cmurray@bhfs.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9094105) filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B- Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons N. Pelosi, #5 Summons B. Thompson, #6 Summons E. Cheney, #7 Summons A. Schiff, #8 Summons J. Raskin, #9 Summons S. Lofgren, #10 Summons E. Luria, #11 Summons P. Aguilar, #12 Summons S. Murphy, #13 Summons A. Kinzinger, #14 Summons Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol)(Murray, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE v. PELOSI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Christopher O. Murray
Represented By: Julian Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY PELOSI
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENNIE G. THOMPSON
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH L. CHENEY
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM B. SCHIFF
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE B. RASKIN
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN E. LOFGREN
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE G. LURIA
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER R. AGUILAR
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE MURPHY
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM D. KINZINGER
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELELCT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATEE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Eric Randal Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
Represented By: Jacob Alan Sommer
Represented By: Marc J. Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Charles Robert Spies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?