JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON et al
Plaintiff: JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, JACQUELINE CARTER, BRIAN C PLITT, iRIS MCCOLLUM GREEN, EMANUEL PAYTON, INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C. and BRIAN C. PLITT
Case Number: 1:2022cv00848
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #23 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect court header/case caption/case number. Please refile. Incorrect document or case. Please refile. (zeg)
May 24, 2022 Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel MOTION to Strike filed by JACQUELINE CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Green, Iris)
May 24, 2022 Filing 24 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel MOTION to Strike filed by EMANUEL PAYTON. (Green, Iris)
May 23, 2022 Filing 23 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BRIAN C. PLITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Karl, John) Modified on 5/27/2022 (zeg).
May 23, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BRIAN C. PLITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Karl, John)
May 19, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous MOTION for Sanctions filed by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lourie, Vanessa)
May 19, 2022 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Robinson, Wendell)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Industrial Bank of Washington shall file its response to Plaintiff's Opposition on or before May 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/16/2022. (lcapm1)
May 12, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lourie, Vanessa)
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Iris McCollum Green, I on behalf of JACQUELINE CARTER (Green, Iris)
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Iris McCollum Green, I on behalf of EMANUEL PAYTON (Green, Iris)
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Disqualify , MOTION to Strike by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Robinson, Wendell). Added MOTION to Strike on 5/12/2022 (zeg).
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #12 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to iriseagain@aol.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed, 2. Two-part document; second docket entry is required, 3. Notice of Appearance needs to be refiled in a separate docket entry (zeg, )
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #15 Answer to Complaint, #14 MOTION for Order . The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile. (zeg)
May 6, 2022 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Complaint by EMANUEL PAYTON.(Green, Iris) Modified on 5/9/2022 (zeg).
May 6, 2022 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Order by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Robinson, Wendell) Modified on 5/9/2022 (zeg).
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous MOTION for Sanctions filed by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Robinson, Wendell)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by EMANUEL PAYTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration Jacqueline Carter, #4 Notice of Appearance)(Green, Iris) Modified docket event/text on 5/9/2022 (zeg).
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lourie, Vanessa). Added MOTION for Sanctions on 4/27/2022 (znmw).
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BRIAN C. PLITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karl, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Karl, Jr on behalf of BRIAN C. PLITT (Karl, John)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant BRIAN C. PLITT to Answer. Defendant PLITT's answer is now due on or before May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/22/2022. (lcapm1)
April 18, 2022 RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Robinson, Wendell).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/25/2022. (znm) Modified on 4/18/2022 (znm).
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JACQUELINE CARTER served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022 (Robinson, Wendell) Modified party served on 4/22/2022 (zeg).
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EMANUEL PAYTON served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022 (Robinson, Wendell) Modified party served on 4/22/2022 (zeg).
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C. served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022 (Robinson, Wendell) Modified party served on 4/22/2022 (zeg).
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRIAN C. PLITT served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022 (Robinson, Wendell) Modified party served on 4/22/2022 (zeg).
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Robinson, Wendell)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to JACQUELINE CARTER, IRIS MCCOLLUM GREEN, INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C., EMANUEL PAYTON, BRIAN C. PLITT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
March 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9136140) filed by JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Wendell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAH KENTE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Wendell C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE CARTER
Represented By: Iris McCollum Green, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN C PLITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iRIS MCCOLLUM GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMANUEL PAYTON
Represented By: Iris McCollum Green, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, D.C.
Represented By: Vanessa Carpenter Lourie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN C. PLITT
Represented By: John F. Karl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?