JENKINS et al v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. JENKINS, ALTA JEANNETTE CANNADAY, WILLIAM VALENTINE KEENE, STEPHEN D. JACKSON, MARIA P. JONES, WILLIE-LLOYD REEVES, APRIL R. SILVER, DAANEN STRACHAN, SOWANDE S. TICHAWONNA and ANGELA R. TRAPP
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY and HOWARD UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Case Number: 1:2022cv00874
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Receipt on 5/25/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 004729 B. (ztth) (Main Document 15 replaced on 5/26/2022) (ztth). (Additional attachments added on 5/26/2022: #1 Part 2), #2 Part 3), #3 Part 4) #4 Part 5) (ztth). Modified on 5/26/2022 to replace main document and add attachments (ztth).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Temple, Donald)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS. (Temple, Donald)
May 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ERRATA by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand)(Temple, Donald)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS. (Temple, Donald)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Hardy, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardy, Lillian)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS. (Temple, Donald)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of John G. Gloster, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardy, Lillian)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardy, Lillian)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by TIMOTHY L. JENKINS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Temple, Donald)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re: Bar Status; emailed to lillian.hardy@hoganlovells.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ERRATA by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hardy, Lillian)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to lillian.hardy@hoganlovells.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmg)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hardy, Lillian)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lillian S. Hardy on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hardy, Lillian)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004729 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9141849 filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Bylaws, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Superior Court Filings 1, #6 Exhibit F - Superior Court Filings 2, #7 Exhibit G - Superior Court Filings 3, #8 Exhibit H - Fiscal Documents, #9 Exhibit I - Superior Court Filings 3, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Certificate of Service)(Hardy, Lillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS et al v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. JENKINS
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA JEANNETTE CANNADAY
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM VALENTINE KEENE
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN D. JACKSON
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA P. JONES
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE-LLOYD REEVES
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL R. SILVER
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAANEN STRACHAN
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOWANDE S. TICHAWONNA
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA R. TRAPP
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Lillian S. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Lillian S. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Represented By: Lillian S. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?