JOHNSTON v. SINGH et al
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Not Classified By Court: NIKKI L. JOHNSTON and WHALA B. SINGH
Case Number: 1:2022cv01284
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Dawn Austin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Receipt on 6/23/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 001295 V. (znmw)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bryan Neil Musgrave, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-9324748. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NIKKI L. JOHNSTON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Duane)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan N. Musgrave. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 23, 2022. (lcckk1)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Abbott Blocker on behalf of WHALA B. SINGH (Blocker, Renee)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant SINGH ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff by WHALA B. SINGH.(Blocker, Renee)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Answer or otherwise respond to #9 due by 7/5/2022. WHALA B. SINGH Answer or otherwise respond to #9 due by 6/20/2022. (dot)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NIKKI L. JOHNSTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(King, Duane)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by NIKKI L. JOHNSTON.(King, Duane)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane Omar King on behalf of NIKKI L. JOHNSTON (King, Duane)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As Plaintiff has filed a timely #9 Amended Complaint, Defendant United States' #4 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3), Defendant United States shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint on or before July 5, 2022 and Defendant Singh shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint on or before June 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 6, 2022. (lcckk1)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FOX ORDER. Opposition to #4 Motion to Dismiss due June 8, 2022. Reply due June 15, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 18, 2022. (lcckk1)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #4 due by 6/8/2022. Defendants' Reply to #4 due by 6/15/2022. (dot)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to #4 due by 6/8/2022. Defendants' Reply to #4 due by 6/15/2022. (dot)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Government shall file a supplemental declaration by 5/31/2022. (dot)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ERRATA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cirino, Paul)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric D. Radwick)(Cirino, Paul)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Dawn Austin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Government's [1-2] Westfall Declaration and #4 Motion to Dismiss. Neither document explains how Eric Radwick was acting in his official capacity at the time of the alleged incident. Accordingly, on or before May 31, 2022, the Government shall file a supplemental declaration explain Mr. Radwick's official duties and how he was acting in furtherance of those duties at the time of the alleged incident. In the meantime, the #4 Motion to Dismiss is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 17, 2022. (lcckk1)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/2022. (DM)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjm)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 001295 V (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents (Complaint), #2 Westfall Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cirino, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSTON v. SINGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NIKKI L. JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WHALA B. SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?