NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION et al v. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: ONE HUNDRED MILES, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION, LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC. and CARETTA FOUNDATION,INC.
Defendant: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, DANIEL MURRAY and JAMES REPCHECK
Case Number: 1:2022cv01408
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, DANIEL MURRAY, JAMES REPCHECK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cumming, Gregory)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, Dkt. #15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before September 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/13/2022. (lcrdm3)
July 12, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/1/22., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 5/31/2022; DANIEL MURRAY served on 5/31/2022; JAMES REPCHECK served on 5/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Gist, Brian)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Martin Cumming on behalf of FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, DANIEL MURRAY, JAMES REPCHECK (Cumming, Gregory)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Philip Rand on behalf of All Defendants (Rand, Matthew)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Gist on behalf of NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION, ONE HUNDRED MILES (Gist, Brian)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon L. Schwartz on behalf of CARETTA FOUNDATION,INC., LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC. (Schwartz, Jon)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/25/2022. (lcrdm3)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian L. Gist, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9262553. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian L. Gist in Support of Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gerken, Austin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brian L. Gist is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions.Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/25/2022. (lcrdm3)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jonathan Lee Schwartz is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/25/2022. (lcrdm3)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Lee Schwartz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9257293. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CARETTA FOUNDATION,INC., LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, William)
May 23, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart Eubanks, II on behalf of CARETTA FOUNDATION,INC., LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC. (Eubanks, William)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARETTA FOUNDATION, INC., LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26.1 Corp Disclosure Statement)(Eubanks, William) Modified on 5/23/2022 (znmw).
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ONE HUNDRED MILES (Gerken, Austin)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Gerken, Austin)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9251090) filed by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to FAA, #5 Summons Summons to Murray, #6 Summons Summons to Repcheck, #7 Summons Summons to AG, #8 Summons Summons to USAO)(Gerken, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION et al v. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONE HUNDRED MILES
Represented By: Brian Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Austin Donald Gerken, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE CUMBERLAND ISLAND HOMES ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARETTA FOUNDATION,INC.
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL MURRAY
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES REPCHECK
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?