ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC. et al v. GREYHOUND LINES, INC.
Counter Defendant: ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP. and PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION
Counter Claimant: GREYHOUND LINES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01662
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet and confer in accordance with Local Rule 16.3. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/29/2022. (lcrcl2)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP. by GREYHOUND LINES, INC..(Kelley, Toyja)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GREYHOUND LINES, INC. (Kelley, Toyja)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GREYHOUND LINES, INC. (Kelley, Toyja)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Kelley, Toyja) Modified on 7/12/2022 (zjf).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #30 Rule 26a1 Statement. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile using LCvR26.1 Certificate of Disclosure event. Event located under "NOTICES" category. (zjf)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that #25 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 07/29/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/08/2022. (lcrcl2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Upon consideration of #26 Joint Request Regarding Documents To Be Filed Under Seal, and the Court's #24 Sealed Order, it is hereby ORDERED that: [2-1] Exhibit B to the Complaint shall remain under seal. The parties' proposed redacted version of Exhibit B to the Complaint shall be filed on the public record. [2-2] Exhibit C to the Complaint shall be UNSEALED. The Court's #22 Memorandum Opinion shall be UNSEALED. The Court's #23 Sealed Order shall be UNSEALED. The Court's #24 Sealed Order shall be UNSEALED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/06/2022. (lcrcl2)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT - JOINT Request Regarding Documents To Be Filed Under Seal by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Public Redacted Version, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Toyja)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SEALED Exhibits B & C re #1 Complaint, filed by PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP., ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Plaintiffs' shall file proposed redaction by 7/5/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/1/2022. (zlsj)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEALED ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/1/2022. (lsj)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION re Plaintiffs' Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/1/2022.(zlsj)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that #9 Temporary Restraining Order is extended for fourteen days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/24/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Second) of Eugene Berardi, #2 Declaration of Alexander Berardi, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O)(Atkins, Alden)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of T. Koch, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Complaint SDNY Greyhound v. Adirondack, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Complaint NDNY Adirondack v. Greyhound, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Second Ammdmnt 2 RPA, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 - Berardi threat to terminate RPA, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 - Trailways and Greyhound End Partnership After 25 Years, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 - May 31, 2022 T. Koch email to A. Berardi, #9 Exhibit Ex 8 - Froehlich Letter of June 6, 2022, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 - Interline Examples Slides, #11 Exhibit Ex 10 - New York to Albany Schedule Comparison, #12 Exhibit Ex 11 - Alex Berardi June 12, 2022 email., #13 Exhibit Ex 12 - Ticket Selling Agreement on Trailways.com., #14 Exhibit Ex 13 - Anne Noonan Feb. 2018 email, #15 Exhibit Ex 14 - Anne Noonan Jan 2019 email., #16 Exhibit Ex 15 - Adirondack 12.17.21 Press Release about website, #17 Declaration Declaration of T. Martinez, #18 Exhibit Ex 16 - Aug. 18, 2018 email from Stapley with redline, #19 Exhibit Ex 17 - 11919 email from Tricia Martinez with redline, #20 Exhibit Ex 18 - Pool Termination notice letter, #21 Declaration Declaration of J. Froehlich, #22 Exhibit Ex A - Adirondack Transit Lines et al v Greyhound Lines Inc American Buslines Inc v Greyhound Lines Inc, #23 Declaration Declaration of T. Durham, #24 Declaration Declaration of D. Barnes)(Kelley, Toyja)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that #16 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. Greyhound is ORDERED to submit its opposition to #6 Trailways motion for preliminary injunction by 6/21/2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Trailways may submit a reply by 6/23/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/17/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is ORDERED that #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/17/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION extending time to submit opposition by GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Kelley, Toyja)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert T. Mowrey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9312774. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of R.Mowrey, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kelley, Toyja)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is ORDERED that #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/14/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph N. Froehlich, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9307078. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Froehlich, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kelley, Toyja)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Toyja E. Kelley, Sr on behalf of GREYHOUND LINES, INC. (Kelley, Toyja)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREYHOUND LINES, INC. served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022 (Atkins, Alden)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is ORDERED that #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/13/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction be GRANTED in part and RESERVED in part. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/10/2022. (lcrcl2)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/10/2022. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiffs' Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion GRANTED in part and RESERVED in part; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor) (lsj)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion #6 for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The parties are directed to appear for a Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2022 at 4:15 PM by Telephone/VTC before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Connection information will be emailed to the parties. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/10/2022. (lsj)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rami Abdallah E. Rashmawi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9297634. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rami Abdallah E. Rashmawi, #2 Rashmawi Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene J. Berardi, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP. (Atkins, Alden)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION (Atkins, Alden)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC. (Atkins, Alden)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Sealed), #2 Exhibit C (Sealed), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden) Modified on 7/12/2022 to unseal Exhibit C per #27 Order (zjf).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREYHOUND LINES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9297486) filed by ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC., PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION, PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Public Version), #3 Exhibit C (Public Version), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Atkins, Alden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC. et al v. GREYHOUND LINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ADIRONDACK TRANSIT LINES, INC.
Represented By: Alden Lewis Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PINE HILL-KINGSTON BUS CORP.
Represented By: Alden Lewis Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PASSENGER BUS CORPORATION
Represented By: Alden Lewis Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GREYHOUND LINES, INC.
Represented By: Toyja E. Kelley, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?