GAMBO v. LYFT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gambo
Defendant: LYFT, INC., Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC, Segway, Inc. t/a Segway-Ninebot, Segway Robotics, Inc., Ninebot Inc., Ninebot Inc. a/k/a Ninebot U.S. t/a Segway-Ninebot, Xiaomi USA LLC, SEGWAY INC., SEGWAY ROBOTICS INC. and NINEBOT U.S.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01726
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's partial consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. #24 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Lyft, Inc. shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before August 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/13/2022. (lcrdm2)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Stamatis on behalf of NICHOLAS GAMBO (Stamatis, Nicholas)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 Motion to Compel,, Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Stay, filed by NICHOLAS GAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yannone, John)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Partial MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And To Dismiss or Stay MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay by NICHOLAS GAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yannone, John)
August 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Receipt on 08/07/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 002253 B. (zjm)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. #22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to compel arbitration shall be due on or before August 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/28/2022. (lcrdm2)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And To Dismiss or Stay MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay by NICHOLAS GAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yannone, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. #21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall effect service on Defendant Ninebot Inc. on or before December 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/22/2022. (lcrdm2)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve by NICHOLAS GAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yannone, John)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NINEBOT INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Ninebot Inc. filed by NICHOLAS GAMBO.(Yannone, John)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to stay Rule 26(f) deadlines, Dkt. #18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) the Rule 26(f) conference deadline shall be STAYED until 21 days after the Court rules on Defendants' motion to compel arbitration #17 , (2) the Rule 26(f) report shall be due 14 days after that extended deadline, and (3) the Initial Scheduling Conference set for July 26, 2022, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/18/2022. (lcrdm2)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And To Dismiss or Stay MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay by NINEBOT INC., SEGWAY INC., SEGWAY ROBOTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Middelem, Jenna)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay Arbitration And To Dismiss or Stay by LYFT BIKES AND SCOOTERS, LLC, LYFT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - McGowan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to McGowan Declaration - 2016 Terms, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to McGowan Declaration - 2021 Terms)(Chaney, Rebecca). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 7/14/2022 (zjm).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for July 26, 2022, at 11:30 a.m., to occur via Zoom. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before July 19, 2022. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2022. (lcrdm2)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation #15 , the Court ORDERS that the claims against Defendant Xiaomi USA, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2022. (lcrdm2)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial) Without Prejudice by NICHOLAS GAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Yannone, John)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NINEBOT INC. (Van Middelem, Jenna)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NINEBOT INC..(Van Middelem, Jenna)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SEGWAY INC. (Van Middelem, Jenna)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SEGWAY INC..(Van Middelem, Jenna)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Baden Chaney on behalf of LYFT, INC. (Chaney, Rebecca)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Xiaomi USA, LLC's consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. #5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Defendant Xiaomi USA, LLC shall file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/23/2022. (lcrdm2)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/22/2022. (lcrdm2)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by LYFT, INC..(Reyna, Ruben)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by XIAOMI USA LLC (Barnaby, Kelley)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Plaintiff's Complaint) by XIAOMI USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnaby, Kelley)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Van Middelem on behalf of NINEBOT INC., SEGWAY INC., SEGWAY ROBOTICS INC. (Van Middelem, Jenna)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Notice of Appearance; emailed to jvanmiddelem@grsm.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document, 2. DO NOT REFILE: Please correct your case # for future filings. (zjm, )
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmh)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to rreyna@crowell.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NICHOLAS GAMBO identifying Corporate Parent LYFT, INC., Corporate Parent NASDAQ GLOBAL SELECT MARKET for NICHOLAS GAMBO. (zmh)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Reyna, Ruben) Modified on 6/23/2022 to correct docket entry. See corrected entry #10 (zmh).
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2022 CA 002253 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9311045 filed by LYFT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Copy of All Process, Pleadings, Orders, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Consent from Non-Removing Defendants, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Reyna, Ruben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAMBO v. LYFT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gambo
Represented By: John J. Yannone
Represented By: Nicholas James Stamatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYFT, INC.
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Represented By: Rebecca Baden Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Baden Chaney
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segway, Inc. t/a Segway-Ninebot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segway Robotics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninebot Inc.
Represented By: Jenna Van Middelem
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninebot Inc. a/k/a Ninebot U.S. t/a Segway-Ninebot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaomi USA LLC
Represented By: Kelley C. Barnaby
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEGWAY INC.
Represented By: Jenna Van Middelem
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEGWAY ROBOTICS INC.
Represented By: Jenna Van Middelem
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NINEBOT U.S.
Represented By: Ruben Francisco Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?