SCHMITZ et al v. ERICSSON INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARK SCHMITZ, SUZANNE SCHMITZ, DIANE FOLEY, JOHN W. FOLEY, JOHN E. FOLEY, MARK FOLEY, KATHRYN FOLEY SIMPSON, MARSHA MUELLER, ERIC MUELLER, ARTHUR SOTLOFF, SHIRLEY SOTLOFF, LAUREN SOTLOFF, ALDENE LEE, ESTEFANI VALDEZ, KATRINA GRAHAM, JAMES GRAHAM, II, STEPHANY KERN, DAVID SCHIAVONI, NOE OROSCO, SR., APRIL HESS, KATHERINE MEEKS, LEROY CAIN, JR., PATRICK RUSSELL, ELIZABETH RUSSELL, J.R., K.K., SUSAN WEST, SHERRI SPRINGATE, CHRISTOPHER BOREA, KIM BOREA, ANDREW BISSON, LAURALEE BISSON, VICTORIA JOHNSON, BRANDON CLEVENGER, NANCY CLEVENGER, ROGER KURTZ, STEPHANIE KURTZ, DARLENE SEIGART, CONNIE MADORE, RONNIE MADORE, RICHARD WITTEVEEN, TRENT WITTEVEEN, HEATHER KAUFMAN, DIANE SALYERS, KELLI WINKLER, NORMA ESTES, RICHARD MULLER, II, RICHARD MUELLER, II and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ERICSSON INC. and TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
Case Number: 1:2022cv02317
Filed: August 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2331 Anti-terrorism Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Rochon on behalf of ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Rochon, Mark)
September 20, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Mark J. Rochon Certifying Familiarity With Local Rules by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON re #22 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark J. Rochon)(Ferguson, Laura)
September 16, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Giuffra, Jr on behalf of ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Giuffra, Robert)
September 16, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Cohen Levin on behalf of ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Levin, Sharon)
September 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rein on behalf of ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Rein, David)
September 14, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Robert J. Giuffra, Jr. Certifying Familiarity With This Court's Local Rules by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON re #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert J. Giuffra, Jr., Fee Status: No Fee Paid. filed by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Littleton, Judson)
September 14, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Sharon Cohen Levin Certifying Familiarity With This Court's Local Rules by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharon Cohen Levin, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. filed by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Littleton, Judson)
September 14, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of David M.J. Rein Certifying Familiarity With This Court's Local Rules by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON re #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M.J. Rein, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. filed by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Littleton, Judson)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 , #18 , and #20 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with respect to David M.J. Rein, Sharon Cohen Levin, and Robert J. Giuffra in order for them to appear as co-counsel for Defendants, CONTINGENT on said attorneys filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than SEPTEMBER 20, 2022. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions;. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/14/22. (lcckk3)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #19 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's #15 Order. The #19 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED as to the Court's denial of Attorney Rochon's #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and DENIED WIHTHOUT PREJUDICE as to the Court's denial of Attorney Prime's #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rochon's #8 Motion for Admission of Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED contingent on the requirements specified in this Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/13/22. (lcckk3)
September 7, 2022 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
September 7, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to littletonj@sullcrom.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed, 2. Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please submit payment using event: Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion. (zjm, )
September 6, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 100, receipt number: 202923 re #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M.J. Rein (zjm)
September 6, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 100, receipt number: 202924 re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharon Cohen Levin (zjm)
September 6, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert J. Giuffra, Jr., Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Littleton, Judson)
September 2, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura)
September 2, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to littletonj@sullcrom.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed, 2. Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please submit payment using event: Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion. (zjm, )
September 2, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to littletonj@sullcrom.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed, 2. Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please submit payment using event: Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion. (zjm, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharon Cohen Levin, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Littleton, Judson)
September 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M.J. Rein, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Littleton, Judson)
September 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Littleton, Judson)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 , #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark J. Rochon and Alexandra Prime. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/31/22. (lcckk3)
August 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer to #1 due by 11/29/2022. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 11/29/2022. Opposition due by 1/30/2023. Reply due by 3/1/2023. (dot)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Enter Briefing Schedule and Enlarge Page Limitations. Please see order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/30/22. (lcckk3)
August 30, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (Ferguson, Laura)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexandra Prime, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9478668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn E. Murphy-Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy-Johnson, Dawn)
August 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jeremy Satin on behalf of All Defendants (Satin, Michael)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark J. Rochon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-9478576. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERICSSON INC., TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura G. Ferguson on behalf of All Defendants (Ferguson, Laura)
August 22, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERICSSON INC. served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022 (Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eli J. Kay-Oliphant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/11/2022. (DM)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
August 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c). It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that: (1) plaintiffs are excused from publicly filing their residence address information with their complaint in accordance with Local Civil Rule 5.1(c); and (2) plaintiffs shall file under seal a list containing the names and full residential addresses of all plaintiffs within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/9/22. (lcckk3)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by ANDREW BISSON, LAURALEE BISSON, CHRISTOPHER BOREA, KIM BOREA, LEROY CAIN, JR, BRANDON CLEVENGER, NANCY CLEVENGER, NORMA ESTES, DIANE FOLEY, DIANE FOLEY(For the estate of JAMES FOLEY), JOHN E. FOLEY, JOHN W. FOLEY, MARK FOLEY, JAMES GRAHAM, II, KATRINA GRAHAM, APRIL HESS, J.R., VICTORIA JOHNSON, K.K., HEATHER KAUFMAN, STEPHANY KERN, ROGER KURTZ, STEPHANIE KURTZ, ALDENE LEE, CONNIE MADORE, RONNIE MADORE, KATHERINE MEEKS, ERIC MUELLER, MARSHA MUELLER, RICHARD MUELLER, II, RICHARD MULLER, II, NOE OROSCO, SR, ELIZABETH RUSSELL, PATRICK RUSSELL, DIANE SALYERS, DAVID SCHIAVONI, MARK SCHMITZ, SUZANNE SCHMITZ, DARLENE SEIGART, KATHRYN FOLEY SIMPSON, ARTHUR SOTLOFF, ARTHUR SOTLOFF(for the estate of STEVEN SOTLOFF), LAUREN SOTLOFF, SHIRLEY SOTLOFF, SHERRI SPRINGATE, ESTEFANI VALDEZ, SUSAN WEST, KELLI WINKLER, RICHARD WITTEVEEN, TRENT WITTEVEEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9420515) filed by KIM BOREA, ANDREW BISSON, NOE OROSCO, SR, MARK FOLEY, ELIZABETH RUSSELL, SUZANNE SCHMITZ, KATRINA GRAHAM, MARK SCHMITZ, JAMES GRAHAM, II, SHERRI SPRINGATE, ESTEFANI VALDEZ, TRENT WITTEVEEN, PATRICK RUSSELL, J.R., K.K., DARLENE SEIGART, LAUREN SOTLOFF, DAVID SCHIAVONI, RICHARD MULLER, II, LEROY CAIN, JR, ERIC MUELLER, CHRISTOPHER BOREA, VICTORIA JOHNSON, ARTHUR SOTLOFF, NORMA ESTES, APRIL HESS, RONNIE MADORE, DIANE SALYERS, SHIRLEY SOTLOFF, KATHERINE MEEKS, SUSAN WEST, JOHN E. FOLEY, RICHARD MUELLER, II, STEPHANIE KURTZ, DIANE FOLEY, BRANDON CLEVENGER, MARSHA MUELLER, ARTHUR SOTLOFF(for the estate of STEVEN SOTLOFF), CONNIE MADORE, KELLI WINKLER, ALDENE LEE, KATHRYN FOLEY SIMPSON, ROGER KURTZ, DIANE FOLEY(For the estate of JAMES FOLEY), LAURALEE BISSON, NANCY CLEVENGER, HEATHER KAUFMAN, RICHARD WITTEVEEN, STEPHANY KERN, JOHN W. FOLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sparacino, Ryan) Modified on 8/9/2022 to correct filer name (zsb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHMITZ et al v. ERICSSON INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK SCHMITZ
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE SCHMITZ
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE FOLEY
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. FOLEY
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. FOLEY
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK FOLEY
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN FOLEY SIMPSON
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHA MUELLER
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC MUELLER
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR SOTLOFF
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY SOTLOFF
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN SOTLOFF
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALDENE LEE
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTEFANI VALDEZ
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA GRAHAM
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GRAHAM, II
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANY KERN
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SCHIAVONI
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOE OROSCO, SR.
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL HESS
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MEEKS
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY CAIN, JR.
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK RUSSELL
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH RUSSELL
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K.
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN WEST
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI SPRINGATE
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BOREA
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM BOREA
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW BISSON
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURALEE BISSON
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA JOHNSON
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON CLEVENGER
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY CLEVENGER
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER KURTZ
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE KURTZ
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE SEIGART
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE MADORE
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE MADORE
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WITTEVEEN
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRENT WITTEVEEN
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER KAUFMAN
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE SALYERS
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLI WINKLER
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA ESTES
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MULLER, II
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MUELLER, II
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Eli J. Kay-Oliphant
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICSSON INC.
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Robert J. Giuffra, Jr.
Represented By: David Rein
Represented By: Dawn E. Murphy-Johnson
Represented By: Judson Owen Littleton
Represented By: Mark J. Rochon
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Satin
Represented By: Sharon Cohen Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Robert J. Giuffra, Jr.
Represented By: David Rein
Represented By: Dawn E. Murphy-Johnson
Represented By: Judson Owen Littleton
Represented By: Mark J. Rochon
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Satin
Represented By: Sharon Cohen Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?