LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A., v. NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LUXOTTICA GROUP S.p.A., and LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A.
Defendant: NISAN PERFUME AND WATCHES, INC., TSOLOMON BATTSENGEL and NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02337
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, with prejudice, pursuant to plaintiff's #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 20, 2022. (lcbah3)
September 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A. (Rezvani, Tracy)
September 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 9/20/2022. (ztg)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #10 Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, and DIRECTING defendants Nisan Perfumes and Watches, Inc. and Tsolomon Battsengel to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by September 20, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 7, 2022. (lcbah3)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by TSOLOMON BATTSENGEL, NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Mohamed, Tesfaye)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tesfaye Mohamed on behalf of All Defendants (Mohamed, Tesfaye)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TSOLOMON BATTSENGEL served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022 (Rezvani, Tracy)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A. (Rezvani, Tracy)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC. served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022 (Rezvani, Tracy)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 18, 2022. (lcbah3)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to TSOLOMON BATTSENGEL, NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
August 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmrl)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 ERRATA to Complaint by LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A. re #1 Amended Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Rezvani, Tracy)
August 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to tracy@rezvanilaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9426185) filed by LUXOTTICA GROUP S.p.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BATTSENGEL, #3 Summons NISAN PERFUME AND WATCHES, INC.)(Rezvani, Tracy) Modified on 8/9/2022 to correct docket entry text (zsb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A., v. NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUXOTTICA GROUP S.p.A.,
Represented By: Tracy Diana Rezvani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUXOTTICA GROUP S.P.A.
Represented By: Tracy Diana Rezvani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISAN PERFUME AND WATCHES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSOLOMON BATTSENGEL
Represented By: Tesfaye Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISAN PERFUMES AND WATCHES, INC.
Represented By: Tesfaye Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?