HICKEY et al v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH P. HICKEY and LAUREL ULRICH
Defendant: JOSEPH P. SMITH, JOSEPH J. GRILLO, Richard F. Passarelli, Joseph C. Phair, BV AT JFK, INC., J. CALDWELL CORPORATION, JJJ&R CORPORATION, VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORPORATION, C. Smith Corporation, Strathroy Park Corporation, R.J.J.J. Rest. Corp. and R.J.J.J. RESTAURANT CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2022cv02343
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Complaint due by 10/14/2022. (hmc)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Grillo, Smith, BV at JFK, Inc., C. Smith Corporation, J. Caldwell Corporation, R.J.J.J. Restaurant Corporation, Strathroy Park Corporation, and the Veronica & Josephine Corporation shall respond to the #12 Amended Complaint by October 14, 2022. The Court directs the parties attention to Paragraph 9(A) of the #7 Standing Order which requires that Motions for Extension of Time be filed no later than four business days before any deadline and admonishes the parties to comply with that rule in the future. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on October 5, 2022. (lctnm2)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by BV AT JFK, INC., C. SMITH CORPORATION, JOSEPH J. GRILLO, J. CALDWELL CORPORATION, R.J.J.J. RESTAURANT CORPORATION, JOSEPH P. SMITH, STRATHROY PARK CORPORATION, VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORPORATION. (Wilson, David)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Phair shall respond to the #12 Amended Complaint by October 15, 2022. The Court directs the parties' attention to Paragraph 9(A) of the Court's #7 Standing Order, which requires all motions for extension of time be filed at least four business days before the affected deadline. The Court admonishes the parties to comply with that rule in the future. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/21/22. (lctnm2)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Phair's response to the Complaint due by 10/15/2022. (hmc)
September 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, On Behalf of Defendant Joseph C. Phair by JOSEPH P. HICKEY, LAUREL ULRICH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Phair a 30-day extension to file answer)(Brunenkant, Jon)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #16 Waiver of Service; emailed to jonbrunenkant@gmail.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Form is fillable; document must be a non-fillable PDF (zed, )
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE. VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JOSEPH P. SMITH waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 22 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STRATHROY PARK CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 21 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE. R.J.J.J. RESTAURANT CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JOSEPH J. GRILLO waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 19 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. J. CALDWELL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 18 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. C. SMITH CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BV AT JFK, INC. waiver sent on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 16 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH C. PHAIR served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH J. GRILLO served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JJJ&R CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/26/2022, answer due 10/25/2022; RICHARD F. PASSARELLI waiver sent on 8/26/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (Brunenkant, Jon) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/1/2022) (zed).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JOSEPH P. HICKEY, LAUREL ULRICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tracked Changes to Complaint)(Brunenkant, Jon)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STRATHROY PARK CORPORATION served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. R.J.J.J. RESTAURANT CORPORATION served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BV AT JFK, INC. served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH P. SMITH served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/17/22. (lctnm2)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. C. SMITH CORPORATION served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/5/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORPORATION served on 8/11/2022, answer due 9/1/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JJJ&R CORPORATION served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022 (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (znmg)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 21-02984. (Brunenkant, Jon)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jonbrunenkant@gmail.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing Related Case form. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9427820) filed by JOSEPH P. HICKEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A - 2017 AGREEMENT, #2 Exhibit EXH B - 7-26-19 TERMINATION OF 2017 AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit EXH C - 2021 AGREEMENT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons BV at JFK, INC., #6 Summons C. SMITH CORP., #7 Summons J. CALDWELL CORP., #8 Summons JJJ&R CORP., #9 Summons JOSEPH C. PHAIR, #10 Summons JOSEPH J. GRILLO, #11 Summons JOSEPH P. SMITH, #12 Summons RICHARD F. PASSARELLI, #13 Summons RJJJ REST. CORP., #14 Summons STRATHROY PARK CORP., #15 Summons VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORP.)(Brunenkant, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HICKEY et al v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH P. HICKEY
Represented By: Jon Lodwick Brunenkant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREL ULRICH
Represented By: Jon Lodwick Brunenkant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH P. SMITH
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J. GRILLO
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BV AT JFK, INC.
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. CALDWELL CORPORATION
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJJ&R CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERONICA & JOSEPHINE CORPORATION
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith Corporation
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strathroy Park Corporation
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J.J.J. Rest. Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J.J.J. RESTAURANT CORPORATION
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?