ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. and NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv02587
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Yablonka on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Yablonka, Katie)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(van Houwelingen, Luke)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al., No. 1:22-cv-02587-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Bryan on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Bryan, Kelsey)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Majoras, John)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone R. Childress on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Childress, Tyrone)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Keilty, Kayleigh)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayleigh T. Keilty on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Keilty, Kayleigh)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022; NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022; UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Keilty, Kayleigh)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:22-cv-01883. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: case electronically transferred to the USDC for the District of Columbia (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Synagro Rail, Inc. for Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC.(Keilty, Kayleigh) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Deficiency Notice for Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/8/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10076846.), filed by Environmental Protection & Improvement Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Union Pacific, #3 Summons CSX Transportation, #4 Summons Norfolk Southern)(Keilty, Kayleigh) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Kayleigh T. Keilty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Kelsey Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Luke P. van Houwelingen
Represented By: Eric Fanchiang
Represented By: Katie Yablonka
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Mara Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?