JORDAN et al V. GUNTHER CHARTERS INC. et al
Plaintiff: Rhatia Downs Jordan and Wali Rashid Jordan
Defendant: Gunther Charters Inc., Hunt Valley Motor Coach, Inc., K&V LIMOUSINE SERVICE LLC and STANFORD COLLINS
Case Number: 1:2022cv02637
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Joinder of additional parties will be sought by March 10, 2023; (2) Leave to amend the pleadings will be sought by May 5, 2023; (3) Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) shall be exchanged by October 21, 2022; (4) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures and reports shall be due by February 10, 2023; (5) Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures and reports shall be due by April 7, 2023; (6) Plaintiff's rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be due May 5, 2023; and (6) Discovery shall close by July 7, 2023. A post-discovery status hearing is set for July 7, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/14/2022. (lcjeb2)
October 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2022. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
October 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joinder of Parties due by 3/10/2023. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/10/2023. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 4/7/2023. Plaintiff's rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures due 5/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2023. Discovery due by 7/7/2023. Status Conference set for 7/7/2023 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
October 11, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by GUNTHER CHARTERS INC..(Davey, Matthew)
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Komis, Demosthenes)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 Receipt on 10/5/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 003358 B. (ztth)
September 30, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HUNT VALLEY MOTOR COACH, INC. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022 (Komis, Demosthenes)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GUNTHER CHARTERS INC. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022 (Komis, Demosthenes)
September 23, 2022 Filing 9 ERRATA by RHATIA DOWNS JORDAN re #7 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to Amended Complaint)(Komis, Demosthenes)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to K&V LIMOUSINE SERVICE LLC, STANFORD COLLINS. (ztth)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by RHATIA DOWNS JORDAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Komis, Demosthenes)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Demosthenes Komis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Komis, Demosthenes)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUNTHER CHARTERS INC. (Davey, Matthew)
September 12, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Grounds of Defense by GUNTHER CHARTERS INC..(Davey, Matthew)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for October 14, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. by Zoom. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/12/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by GUNTHER CHARTERS INC.. (Davey, Matthew)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent #3 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 12, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/8/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/12/2022. (znbn)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zmrl)
September 7, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmrl)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 003358 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9483569 filed by Gunther Charters Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Davey, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN et al V. GUNTHER CHARTERS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhatia Downs Jordan
Represented By: Demosthenes Komis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wali Rashid Jordan
Represented By: Demosthenes Komis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunther Charters Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Mawn Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Valley Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Mawn Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&V LIMOUSINE SERVICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANFORD COLLINS
Represented By: Matthew Mawn Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?