UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASSA ABLOY AB et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ASSA ABLOY AB and SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02791
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Scheduling and Case Management Order)(Dahlquist, David)
November 3, 2022 Set/Reset Deadline: The parties are to submit a revised proposed CMO by 12:00 PM (noon) on Wednesday, November 9, 2022. (jth)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 Joint Motion for Entry of Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order, memorializing the orders issued at the October 28, 2022 scheduling conference, and setting forth steps for finalizing the Case Management Order. A further status conference is scheduled for December 5, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in person in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/3/22. (DMK)
November 3, 2022 Filing 43 COMPLAINT (REDACTED) against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Huppert, Matthew)
November 2, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Culley on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Culley, Daniel)
November 2, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by David Irving Gelfand on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Gelfand, David)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated at the scheduling conference held on October 28, 2022, defendants' motion to seal their competitively sensitive information in the complaint #19 (redacted)/ #31 (sealed) is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the complaint #1 UNDER SEAL. It is ORDERED that the parties must file by November 8, 2022 a public, redacted version of the complaint with the redactions set forth in defendants' sealed supplemental reply in further support of their motion #40 . It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' original motion to seal the complaint #16 and their unopposed motion to expedite briefing on the motion #18 are DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/2/22. (DMK)
October 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2022. Scheduling Order to be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
October 25, 2022 Filing 40 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. re #31 Sealed Motion (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #39 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to file UNDER SEAL [39-1] Defendants' Supplemental Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/25/22. (DMK)
October 24, 2022 Filing 39 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1- Complaint (Redacted), #3 [Proposed] Order)(Spagnoletti, Paul)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A Scheduling Conference is set in this matter for October 28, 2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 in person before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/22. (DMK)
October 14, 2022 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order)(Dahlquist, David)
October 14, 2022 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by ASSA ABLOY AB.(Loughlin, Charles)
October 14, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC..(Spagnoletti, Paul)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #35 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendants' response to the complaint is due by October 17, 2022. The Court encourages the parties to explore whether they can come to an agreement as to which portions of the complaint can be unsealed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/6/22. (DMK)
October 5, 2022 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loughlin, Charles)
October 3, 2022 Filing 34 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. re #31 Sealed Motion to Seal Sensitive Information. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/3/22. (DMK)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #28 defendants' motion to file document under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file UNDER SEAL [28-1] Defendants' Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/3/22. (DMK)
September 28, 2022 Filing 32 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #31 Sealed Motion to Seal Sensitive Information.(znmw)
September 28, 2022 Filing 31 SEALED MOTION to Seal Sensitive Information filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(znmw) Modified filers on 9/29/2022 (znmw).
September 28, 2022 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Huppert, Matthew)
September 28, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY re #19 MOTION for Order to Seal the Complaint (Corrected Motion) Defendants' Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Seal (REDACTED) filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Loughlin, Charles)
September 28, 2022 Filing 28 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Defendants Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint (SEALED), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loughlin, Charles)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal and #26 Plaintiff's Motion to Temporarily Seal its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Seal the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file UNDER SEAL Defendants' Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint [17-1] and Exhibit 1 [17-2]. The Clerk of Court is further directed to file UNDER SEAL Plaintiff's Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Seal [26-1]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/28/22. (DMK)
September 26, 2022 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #19 Motion for Order, (REDACTED) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huppert, Matthew)
September 26, 2022 Filing 26 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Seal Complaint)(Huppert, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikolaus Williams on behalf of SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Williams, Nikolaus)
September 22, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Andres, Greg)
September 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Joseph Burke on behalf of SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Burke, Arthur)
September 22, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Spagnoletti on behalf of SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Spagnoletti, Paul)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 #11 #12 #13 Motions for Leave of Paul Spagnoletti, Arthur J. Burke, Greg D. Andres, and Nikolaus J. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/22/22. (DMK)
September 21, 2022 Filing 21 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSA ABLOY AB (Loughlin, Charles)
September 21, 2022 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Solomon, Jesse)
September 20, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Order to Seal the Complaint (Corrected Motion) by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles)
September 20, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Seal Sensitive Information in the Complaint (ECF No. 17) by ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loughlin, Charles)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants' motion #16 does not contain the government's position and thus does not comply with Local Rule 7(m). Defendants are ORDERED to submit a corrected motion that complies with the local rules by September 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/20/2022. (lcabj1)
September 19, 2022 Filing 17 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASSA ABLOY AB (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles)
September 19, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Order to Seal the Complaint by ASSA ABLOY AB. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles)
September 19, 2022 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Order to Seal the Complaint (REDACTED) by ASSA ABLOY AB. (Loughlin, Charles) Modified on 9/20/2022 counsel refiled at Entry #16 (zjm). Modified on 9/21/2022 (jth).
September 19, 2022 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASSA ABLOY AB (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loughlin, Charles) Modified on 9/20/2022 counsel refiled at entry #17 (zjm).
September 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nikolaus J. Williams, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9531091. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nikolaus J. Williams, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
September 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Greg D. Andres, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9531059. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg D. Andres, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
September 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Arthur J. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9531025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arthur J. Burke, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
September 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Spagnoletti, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9530968. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Spagnoletti, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
September 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Solomon on behalf of SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Solomon, Jesse)
September 19, 2022 RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Kurian Shaw on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Shaw, Anna), AND #7 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Michael Breed on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Breed, Logan).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/26/2022. (znmw) Modified on 9/20/2022 (znmw).
September 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Dahlquist on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dahlquist, David)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Michael Breed on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Breed, Logan)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Bernick on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Bernick, Justin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Kurian Shaw on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Shaw, Anna)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Leitzsey Monts, III on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Monts, William)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Loughlin on behalf of ASSA ABLOY AB (Loughlin, Charles)
September 15, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
September 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSA ABLOY AB, SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC. (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Huppert, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/15/2022) (znmg).
September 15, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASSA ABLOY AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Robert Huppert
Represented By: David E. Dahlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSA ABLOY AB
Represented By: Charles A. Loughlin
Represented By: William Leitzsey Monts, III
Represented By: Anna Kurian Shaw
Represented By: Daniel P. Culley
Represented By: David Irving Gelfand
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Logan Michael Breed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECTRUM BRANDS HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Jesse Solomon
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Nikolaus Williams
Represented By: Paul Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?