ANIMAL OUTLOOK v. AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANIMAL OUTLOOK
Defendant: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC. and DOES 1-20
Not Classified By Court: Animal Outlook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02842
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - AFFIDAVIT OF CHERYL TONER, MS, RDN)(Doherty, Dawn) Modified docket relationship on 11/8/2022 (zed).
October 20, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 Motion to Dismiss,, in Lieu of Answer filed by ANIMAL OUTLOOK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Piper Hoffman, #2 Proposed Order)(Huggins, Teresa)
October 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Richard Sohn on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Sohn, Jared)
October 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Klein on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Klein, Brian)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Huggins on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Huggins, Teresa)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Teresa L. Huggins, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Teresa L. Huggins is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 17, 2022. (lccjn1)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian E. Klein, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brian E. Klein is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 17, 2022. (lccjn1)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jared R. Sohn, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jared R. Sohn is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 17, 2022. (lccjn1)
October 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jared R. Sohn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9596333. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMAL OUTLOOK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jared R. Sohn, #2 Proposed Order)(Meister, Melissa)
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian E. Klein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9596320. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMAL OUTLOOK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian E. Klein, #2 Proposed Order)(Meister, Melissa)
October 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Teresa L. Huggins, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9596255. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMAL OUTLOOK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teresa L. Huggins, #2 Proposed Order)(Meister, Melissa)
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Jared Richard Sohn on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Sohn, Jared)
October 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Teresa Huggins on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Huggins, Teresa)
October 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/20/2022. Reply due by 11/7/2022. (zcal)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss by October 20, 2022. And it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by November 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 7, 2022. (lccjn1)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 Receipt on 10/6/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 003830 B. (zed)
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Lee White on behalf of AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC. (White, Jacob)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by ANIMAL OUTLOOK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian E. Klein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Meister, Melissa)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Meister, Melissa)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Melissa A. Meister on behalf of ANIMAL OUTLOOK (Meister, Melissa)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC. (Doherty, Dawn)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Doherty, Dawn)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 26, 2022. (lccjn1)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
September 20, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmrl)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022-CA-003830-B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9530514 filed by AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 1 - All Documents from DC Superior Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Defendant's Civil Cover Sheet)(Doherty, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANIMAL OUTLOOK v. AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Animal Outlook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Dawn C Doherty
Represented By: Jacob L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIMAL OUTLOOK
Represented By: Brian Edward Klein
Represented By: Melissa A. Meister
Represented By: Teresa Huggins
Represented By: Jared Richard Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?