CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS et al v. REGAN
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: MICHAEL S. REGAN
Case Number: 1:2022cv03005
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by MICHAEL S. REGAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Elliot)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before February 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12-2-2022. (lcrc3)
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, SIERRA CLUB. Attorney Emma C. Cheuse terminated. (Cheuse, Emma)
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Edward Gormley on behalf of CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, SIERRA CLUB (Gormley, Neil)
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL S. REGAN served on 10/7/2022 (Cheuse, Emma)
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/7/2022. (Cheuse, Emma)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/7/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/6/2022. (Cheuse, Emma)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Higgins on behalf of MICHAEL S. REGAN (Higgins, Elliot)
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, )
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Cheuse, Emma)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Cheuse, Emma)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION (Cheuse, Emma)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS (Cheuse, Emma)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against MICHAEL S. REGAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9577725) filed by SIERRA CLUB, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Administrator, U.S. EPA, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney DC, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Cheuse, Emma)
October 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS et al v. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Edward Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSOURI COALITION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Edward Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Edward Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Edward Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL S. REGAN
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?