BUIE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. BUIE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2022cv03501
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/5/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/05/2022. (zjm)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 203468) filed by CHRISTOPHER L. BUIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjm)
November 14, 2022 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUIE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. BUIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?