DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. PRO-FOOTBALL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE and ROGER GOODELL
Case Number: 1:2022cv03813
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by John Leslie Brownlee on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Brownlee, John)
February 7, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Mendrala, Andrew)
February 2, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #31 Motion for Joinder; emailed to kportlock@gibsondunn.com, cc'd 23 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document, 2. DO NOT REFILE. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page. (zjm, )
January 31, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE for Joinder re #30 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Portlock, Karin) Modified on 2/2/2023 to correct event (zjm).
January 31, 2023 Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gregg Costa is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/27/2023. (lcsr)
January 27, 2023 RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #29 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Joseph Warin on behalf of ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Warin, Francis).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/3/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 2/3/2023 (zbaj).
January 26, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Joseph Warin on behalf of ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Warin, Francis)
January 24, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregg Costa, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9810624. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregg Costa, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Lucas)
January 13, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin S. Portlock on behalf of ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Portlock, Karin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Aycock on behalf of ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Aycock, Amanda)
January 11, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Haller on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Haller, David)
January 10, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Patton Seymour on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Seymour, Karen)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Karin Portlock is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/10/2023. (lcsr)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amanda M. Aycock is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/10/2023. (lcsr)
January 9, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- KARIN PORTLOCK, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9777011. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Portlock, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Lucas)
January 9, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- AMANDA M. AYCOCK, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9776994. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda M. Aycock, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Lucas)
January 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Taylor on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Taylor, Timothy); Modified filers and text on 1/9/2023, at the request of counsel (ztth).
January 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart G. Nash on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER. (Nash, Stuart) Modified on filers and text 1/9/2023, at the request of counsel. (ztth).
January 6, 2023 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Mendrala, Andrew)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2. The affiant must provide sufficient information for the court to determine whether the affiant engages in practice from an office located in the District of Columbia, notwithstanding that the affiant regularly practices from an office outside the District of Columbia. The motion must be accompanied by a certificate of the court or bar for the state in which the applicant regularly practices, which has been issued within 30 days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/6/2023. (lcsr)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #15 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and #18 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #16 . Defendants shall file a response to #16 by January 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/6/2023. (lcsr)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Karen Patton Seymour is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/6/2023. (lcsr)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2. The affiant must provide sufficient information for the court to determine whether the affiant engages in practice from an office located in the District of Columbia, notwithstanding that the affiant regularly practices from an office outside the District of Columbia. The motion must be accompanied by a certificate of the court or bar for the state in which the applicant regularly practices, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/6/2023. (lcsr)
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER. (Littleton, Judson)
January 4, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James Anthony Towns, Sr on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Towns, James) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/4/2023) (znmw).
January 3, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Copy of complaint due by 1/5/2023. (tb)
December 30, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Mendrala, Andrew)
December 29, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of Plaintiff's Anticipated Motion to Remand by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Mendrala, Andrew)
December 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Service and Deadlines by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Mendrala, Andrew)
December 29, 2022 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Mendrala, Andrew)
December 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Charles Mendrala on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mendrala, Andrew) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/28/2022) (zjm).
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By January 5, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. By that same date, Plaintiff shall also file a Notice informing the court: 1) whether the Defendants have been properly served and what efforts have been made to effectuate service on any unserved Defendants; and 2) the deadlines for service of process and Defendants' answers. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/28/2022. (lcsr)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DANIEL SNYDER, PRO-FOOTBALL, INC. filed by DANIEL SNYDER, PRO-FOOTBALL, INC..(Littleton, Judson)
December 27, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to littletonj@sullcrom.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (Briggs, Charles)
December 27, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zcb)
December 23, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karin Portlock, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9753537. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Lucas)
December 23, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda M. Aycock, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9753533. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amanda M. Aycock, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Townsend, Lucas)
December 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Townsend, Lucas)
December 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas C. Townsend on behalf of ROGER GOODELL, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE (Townsend, Lucas)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen Patton Seymour, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9753470. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shields, Kamil)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kamil R. Shields on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Shields, Kamil)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PRO-FOOTBALL, INC. (Littleton, Judson)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., DANIEL SNYDER (Littleton, Judson)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022-CAB-005171 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9753458 filed by DANIEL SNYDER, PRO-FOOTBALL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Littleton, Judson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. PRO-FOOTBALL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Andrew Charles Mendrala
Represented By: James Anthony Towns, Sr.
Represented By: Jessica E Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO-FOOTBALL, INC.
Represented By: Kamil R. Shields
Represented By: Judson Owen Littleton
Represented By: David L. Haller
Represented By: Timothy Taylor
Represented By: John Leslie Brownlee
Represented By: Karen Patton Seymour
Represented By: Stuart G. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SNYDER
Represented By: Kamil R. Shields
Represented By: Judson Owen Littleton
Represented By: John Leslie Brownlee
Represented By: Karen Patton Seymour
Represented By: Stuart G. Nash
Represented By: David L. Haller
Represented By: Timothy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Francis Joseph Warin
Represented By: Amanda Aycock
Represented By: Karin S. Portlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER GOODELL
Represented By: Lucas C. Townsend
Represented By: Amanda Aycock
Represented By: Francis Joseph Warin
Represented By: Karin S. Portlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?