JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. v. CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: THE JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. and JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC.
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY and CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv03832
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleading, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleading, is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 23, 2023. (lcrbw1)
February 20, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Dietz, #3 Exhibit Exhibit List to Dietz Declaration, #4 Exhibit Dietz Declaration Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Dietz Declaration Exhibit B, #6 Declaration Declaration of Victor Peters, #7 Exhibit Exhibit List to Peters Declaration, #8 Exhibit Peters Declaration Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Peters Declaration Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit Peters Declaration Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit Peters Declaration Exhibit D, #12 Declaration Declaration of Nancy Tordai, #13 Exhibit Exhibit List to Tordai Declaration, #14 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit B, #16 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit C, #17 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit E, #19 Exhibit Tordai Declaration Exhibit F, #20 Declaration Second Declaration of Nancy Tordai, #21 Exhibit Exhibit List to Second Tordai Declaration, #22 Exhibit Tordai Second Declaration Exhibit A, #23 Exhibit Tordai Second Declaration Exhibit B, #24 Exhibit Tordai Second Declaration Exhibit C, #25 Exhibit Tordai Second Declaration Exhibit D, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie)
February 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy K. Tordai, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9856993. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of good standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Gil Preuss)(Enschede, Andrew)
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Declaration Declaration of David Dietz, #5 Exhibit Index of the Exhibits to Declaration of David Dietz, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Dietz Declaration-Policy, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B to Dietz Declaration, #8 Declaration Declaration of Victor Peters, #9 Exhibit Index of Exhibits to Declaration of Victor Peters, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A to Peters Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B to Peters Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C to Peters Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D to Peters Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Peters Declaration, #15 Declaration Declaration of Nancy Tordai, #16 Exhibit Index of Exhibits to Declaration of Nancy Tordai, #17 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tordai Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit B to Tordai Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit C to Tordai Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D to Tordai Declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit E to Tordai Declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit F to Tordai Declaration)(Machado, Leslie)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Enschede on behalf of JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. (Enschede, Andrew)
February 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Sellers Harris on behalf of JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. (Harris, Colin)
January 18, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie)
January 18, 2023 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Machado, Leslie)
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Chefitz on behalf of JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. (Chefitz, Daniel)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 6, 2023. (lcrbw1)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023 (Zevnik, Paul)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (zmrl)
December 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmrl)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to The Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by THE JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC..(Zevnik, Paul)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9757906) filed by THE JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zevnik, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC. v. CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: Paul Anton Zevnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: Andrew J. Enschede
Represented By: Colin Sellers Harris
Represented By: Daniel E. Chefitz
Represented By: Paul Anton Zevnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Leslie Paul Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?