KRAMER v. REALPAGE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KATE KRAMER
Defendant: REALPAGE, INC., ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC, AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL, LLC, BELL PARTNERS, INC., BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST, CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC., EQUITY RESIDENTIAL, GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC, HIGHMARK RESIDENTIAL, LLC and UDR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03835
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #27 NOTICE of Appearance by William Leitzsey Monts, III on behalf of GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC (Monts, William).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/28/2023. (zbaj)
February 17, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by William Leitzsey Monts, III on behalf of GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC (Monts, William)
February 17, 2023 Filing 26 ERRATA Corrected Notice of MDL No. 3071 In Re: RealPage, Inc., Rental Software by GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC re #25 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL 3071 Motion for Transfer)(Monts, William)
February 17, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 In Re: RealPage, Inc., Rental Software Antitrust Litigation (No. II) by GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC (Monts, William)
February 15, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2023. (tb)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The parties' #23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for Stipulating Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby suspended. The deadline for Plaintiff to move for class certification as required by LCvR 23.1(b) is hereby suspended. The parties shall meet and confer and file a status report with the Court by March 15, 2023. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/13/2023. (lcja)
February 8, 2023 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification Pursuant to LCvR 23.1(b) by KATE KRAMER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levis, Christian) Modified on 2/10/2023 to update relief (zjm).
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Proof of Service re #21 Notice of Appearance (zjm)
February 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Notice of Appearance (zjm)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BELL PARTNERS, INC. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HIGHMARK RESIDENTIAL, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE. UDR, INC. waiver sent on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/19/2023. (Levis, Christian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. waiver sent on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Levis, Christian)
January 30, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Notice of Appearance(zjm)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Levis, Christian)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. EQUITY RESIDENTIAL waiver sent on 1/12/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Levis, Christian)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. REALPAGE, INC. waiver sent on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/19/2023. (Levis, Christian) Modified on 1/27/2023 to correct date served and answer date (zjm).
January 23, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Notice of Potential Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Errata 7)(zjm)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Corrected Proof of Service re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(zjm) Modified on 1/13/2023 to add MDL No.(zjm).
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of MDL No. 3071 - Motion for Transfer: IN RE: APARTMENT RENTAL SOFTWAREANTITRUST LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Schedule of Actions, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22)(zjm)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
January 5, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmrl)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,, filed by KATE KRAMER. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by KATE KRAMER. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Levis, Christian)
January 4, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to clevis@lowey.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Summonses incorrect. Please switch plaintiff and defendant fields., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (Langford, Marquia)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 ERRATA by KATE KRAMER re #1 Complaint,,. (Levis, Christian)
January 3, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to clevis@lowey.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (Langford, Marquia)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC, AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL, LLC, BELL PARTNERS, INC., BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST, CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC., EQUITY RESIDENTIAL, GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC, HIGHMARK RESIDENTIAL, LLC, REALPAGE, INC., UDR, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9758584) filed by KATE KRAMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Levis, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRAMER v. REALPAGE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATE KRAMER
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALPAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL PARTNERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUITY RESIDENTIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: William Leitzsey Monts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHMARK RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?