COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC v. JOHNSON et al
Not Classified By Court: Coachella Music Festival, LLC, Goldenvoice, LLC, Justin Johnson and Kelsye Adams
Case Number: 1:2023cv00288
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina Roumiantseva on behalf of COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC (Roumiantseva, Dina)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Steele on behalf of COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC (Steele, David)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Erick Lauridsen on behalf of COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC (Lauridsen, Steven)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Admission of Steven E. Lauridsen Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Admission of Steven E. Lauridsen Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Steven E. Lauridsen, Tucker Ellis LLP, 515 South Flower Street, 42nd Floor, Los Angeles, California, 90071, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 19, 2023. (lcrbw3)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Admission of David J. Steele Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Admission of David J. Steele Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that David J. Steele, Tucker Ellis LLP, 515 South Flower Street, 42nd Floor, Los Angeles, California, 90071, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 19, 2023. (lcrbw3)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Admission of Dina Roumiantseva Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Courts rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Admission of Dina Roumiantseva Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Dina Roumiantseva, Tucker Ellis LLP, 515 South Flower Street, 42nd Floor, Los Angeles, California, 90071, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 19, 2023. (lcrbw3)
March 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dina Roumiantseva, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9933088. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brookey, Brian)
March 16, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Steele, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9933051. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brookey, Brian)
March 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven E. Lauridsen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9933001. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brookey, Brian)
February 8, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to KELSYE ADAMS, JUSTIN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
February 2, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zrtw)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Coachella Music Festival, LLC, Goldenvoice, LLC (Brookey, Brian)
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelsye Adams, Justin Johnson with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9830421) filed by Coachella Music Festival, LLC, Goldenvoice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Adams, #3 Summons Johnson, #4 AO 120-Report on Filing or Determination of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10)(Brookey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Coachella Music Festival, LLC
Represented By: Brian Kent Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Goldenvoice, LLC
Represented By: Brian Kent Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Justin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kelsye Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?