IN LUX RESEARCH et al v. HULL MCGUIRE PC et al
Plaintiff: IN LUX RESEARCH and LINDSAY OLSON
Defendant: HULL MCGUIRE PC, JOHN DANIEL HULL, DAVID B. SMITH, NICHOLAS D. SMITH, DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC, CARMEN D. HERNANDEZ, NAYIB HASSAN, LAW OFFICES OF NAYIB HASSAN, P.A., STEVEN ALAN METCALF, II and METCALF & METCALF, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00523
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by CARMEN D. HERNANDEZ. (Hernandez, Carmen)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' #15 Motion for Extension is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with LCvR 7(m). So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/21/2023. (lcjeb4)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by IN LUX RESEARCH, LINDSAY OLSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order and service list per local rules 7(c) and 7(k))(Bartolomei, James)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Smith Defendants' #13 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) The Smith Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by May 16, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/20/2023.(lcjeb3)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/16/2023. ( nbn)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC, DAVID B. SMITH, NICHOLAS D. SMITH. (Smith, Nicholas)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Smith on behalf of DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC, DAVID B. SMITH, NICHOLAS D. SMITH (Smith, Nicholas)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/21/2023. (nbn)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that if Plaintiffs oppose Defendants' #13 Motion for Extension, they shall file such Opposition by April 21, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/19/2023. (lcjeb3)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE. NAYIB HASSAN waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; LAW OFFICES OF NAYIB HASSAN, P.A. waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Bartolomei, James)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JOHN DANIEL HULL waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; HULL MCGUIRE PC waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Bartolomei, James)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. METCALF & METCALF, P.C. waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; STEVEN ALAN METCALF, II waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Bartolomei, James)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; DAVID B. SMITH waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; NICHOLAS D. SMITH waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Bartolomei, James)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Defendants HULL MCGUIRE PC, JOHN DANIEL HULL, DAVID B. SMITH, NICHOLAS D. SMITH, DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC, CARMEN D. HERNANDEZ, NAYIB HASSAN, LAW OFFICES OF NAYIB HASSAN, P.A., STEVEN ALAN METCALF, II, METCALF & METCALF, P.C. by LINDSAY OLSON, IN LUX RESEARCH re #1 Complaint,, filed by LINDSAY OLSON, IN LUX RESEARCH. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by IN LUX RESEARCH, LINDSAY OLSON.(Bartolomei, James)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Bartolomei, James)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LINDSAY OLSON (Bartolomei, James)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IN LUX RESEARCH (Bartolomei, James)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LINDSAY OLSON, IN LUX RESEARCH re #1 Complaint,, filed by LINDSAY OLSON, IN LUX RESEARCH. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by IN LUX RESEARCH, LINDSAY OLSON.(Bartolomei, James)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC, NAYIB HASSAN, CARMEN D. HERNANDEZ, JOHN DANIEL HULL, HULL MCGUIRE PC, LAW OFFICES OF NAYIB HASSAN, P.A., METCALF & METCALF, P.C., STEVEN ALAN METCALF, II, DAVID B. SMITH, NICHOLAS D. SMITH with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9884758) filed by LINDSAY OLSON, IN LUX RESEARCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Initial invoice for Study and Report, #2 Exhibit EX B - Motion for Extension dated 9/29/22 referencing Study and Report, #3 Exhibit EX C - Copyrighted Report (USCO Registration TX0009206915))(Bartolomei, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN LUX RESEARCH et al v. HULL MCGUIRE PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN LUX RESEARCH
Represented By: James H. Bartolomei, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSAY OLSON
Represented By: James H. Bartolomei, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HULL MCGUIRE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DANIEL HULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. SMITH
Represented By: Nicholas D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS D. SMITH
Represented By: Nicholas D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. SMITH, PLLC
Represented By: Nicholas D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN D. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Carmen D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAYIB HASSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW OFFICES OF NAYIB HASSAN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN ALAN METCALF, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METCALF & METCALF, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?