ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BECERRA
Plaintiff: ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as HIGHLAND HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES doing business as CONTRA COSTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN doing business as SAN JOAQUIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER - LOS ANGELES doing business as CHANDLER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNARDINO doing business, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP doing business as NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC doing business as SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as SONOMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ESSENTIA HEALTH ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SMDC MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS doing business as STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as WATSONVILLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER and COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 1:2023cv00690
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint filed by XAVIER BECERRA. (Bryce, Peter)
May 10, 2023 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, DIGNITY HEALTH, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
May 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
April 30, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond. The court agrees with Defendant that Plaintiffs' pre-answer motion for summary judgment is "premature." Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 advisory committee's note to 2010 amendment subdivision (b). Plaintiffs have not established "good cause" to expedite the matter. 28 U.S.C. 1657(a). The court will adhere to the general practice in cases such as this one of permitting a defendant first to answer or otherwise move to dismiss before ruling on a motion on the merits. Cf. Comm. on Ways & Means, U.S. House of Representatives v. U.S. Dep't of the Treasury, No. 19-cv-1974 (TNM), 2019 WL 4094563, at *2 (D.D.C. Aug. 29, 2019). Accordingly, further briefing on the motion for summary judgment is stayed. Within five days of Defendant either answering or moving to dismiss, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report recommending a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/30/2023. (lcapm1)
April 19, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Further Briefing on Plaintiffs' Summary Judgement Motion MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in the Alternative to a Stay filed by XAVIER BECERRA. (Bryce, Peter)
April 18, 2023 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 Motion to Stay,, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, DIGNITY HEALTH, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing, ECF No. 10, by April 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/18/2023. (lcapm1)
April 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to #10 Motion to Stay Briefing due by 4/21/2023. (smc)
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Further Briefing on Plaintiffs' Summary Judgement Motion, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in the Alternative to a Stay by XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA (Bryce, Peter)
April 4, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, DIGNITY HEALTH, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
April 4, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA filed by EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, DIGNITY HEALTH, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA.(Webster, Stephanie)
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/14/2023. (Webster, Stephanie)
March 21, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/17/2023. (Webster, Stephanie)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 3/16/2023 (Webster, Stephanie)
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
March 15, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, DIGNITY HEALTH, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION (Webster, Stephanie)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9925891) filed by EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC, DIGNITY HEALTH, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP, ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM, SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as HIGHLAND HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES doing business as CONTRA COSTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN doing business as SAN JOAQUIN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER - LOS ANGELES doing business as CHANDLER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNARDINO doing business
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CAMINO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHBAY HEALTHCARE GROUP doing business as NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALI MOMI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - RENO LLC doing business as SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONOMA VALLEY HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as SONOMA VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S DULUTH CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ESSENTIA HEALTH ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SMDC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS doing business as STANFORD HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRAUB CLINIC & HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HEALTH CARE DISTRICT doing business as WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as WATSONVILLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA IRVINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?