MONTANA et al v. CARDONA et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA MONTANA, VINCENT VOLLERO, MICHAEL TURI, CHERYL MILLER, DONALD ELTING, ANNA OCONNOR and ANNA O'CONNOR
Defendant: MIGUEL CARDONA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA
Case Number: 1:2023cv00775
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: granting Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ian D. Prior is hereby ADMITTED to appear on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/2023. (lcja)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline is hereby GRANTED. Defendants' Response to the Complaint is due no later than 05/26/2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/2023. (lcja)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants' Response to the Complaint is due by 05/26/2023.(jth)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nestler, Emily)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Nestler on behalf of All Defendants (Nestler, Emily)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/10/23. (Mills, Christopher) Modified on 5/12/2023 filed in incorrect case. Counsel will refile in correct case. (zjm).
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ian D. Prior, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10014180. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD ELTING, CHERYL MILLER, PATRICIA MONTANA, ANNA O'CONNOR, MICHAEL TURI, VINCENT VOLLERO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Ding, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MIGUEL CARDONA served on 4/4/2023 (Ding, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/4/2023 (Ding, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/05/2023. (Ding, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/23/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2023. (Ding, Michael); Modified on 4/17/2023 to correct answer deadline (ztth).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DONALD ELTING, CHERYL MILLER, PATRICIA MONTANA, ANNA OCONNOR, MICHAEL TURI, VINCENT VOLLERO re #1 Complaint,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ding, Michael)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MIGUEL CARDONA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9947554) filed by ANNA OCONNOR, MICHAEL TURI, VINCENT VOLLERO, CHERYL MILLER, PATRICIA MONTANA, DONALD ELTING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(Ding, Michael)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTANA et al v. CARDONA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA MONTANA
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT VOLLERO
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TURI
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL MILLER
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD ELTING
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA OCONNOR
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA O'CONNOR
Represented By: Michael Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL CARDONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Emily B. Nestler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA
Represented By: Emily B. Nestler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?