JAX LTD. INC. v. SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS et al
Plaintiff: JAX LTD. INC.
Defendant: SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS, NSD HOLDING 2021 APS,, NIKOLAI SCHULTZ DIRKS, NSD HOLDING 2021 APS, SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS and NIKOLAI SCHULTZ DIRKS HASAGER
Case Number: 1:2023cv00789
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAX LTD. INC.. Attorney Kelly D. Hine terminated. (Wooden, Sean)
June 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean S. Wooden on behalf of JAX LTD. INC. (Wooden, Sean)
June 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE Response to May 23, 2023 Order by JAX LTD. INC. re Order,, (Ross, Terence)
May 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proof of service due by 6/21/2023. (hmc)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed the Complaint in this action on March 23, 2023. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiff has yet to file proof of service of each Defendant. The Court directs Plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than June 21, 2023, Plaintiff must either cause process to be served upon each Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. Failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/23/23. (lctnm3)
April 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D. Hine on behalf of JAX LTD. INC. (Hine, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Mazur on behalf of JAX LTD. INC. (Mazur, Julia)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/2023. (lctnm3)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/2023. (lctnm3)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/2023. (lctnm3)
March 29, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsl)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 ERRATA by JAX LTD. INC. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Required by LCvR26.1 of the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, #2 Motion for Admission of Ketty D. Hine Pro Hac Vice - Declaration - Proposed Order.pdf, #3 Motion for Admission of Julia L. Mazur Pro Hac Vice - Declaration - Proposed Order.pdf)(Ross, Terence)
March 27, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by JAX LTD. INC. filed by JAX LTD. INC..(Ross, Terence)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by JAX LTD. INC. filed by JAX LTD. INC..(Ross, Terence)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by JAX LTD. INC. filed by JAX LTD. INC..(Ross, Terence)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by JAX LTD. INC. re #1 Complaint filed by JAX LTD. INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by JAX LTD. INC..(Ross, Terence)
March 27, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to terence.ross@kattenlaw.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 3. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 4. Each defendant should have an individual summons., 5. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Name- Julia L. Mazur, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9951464. Fee Status: Fee Paid by JAX LTD. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ross, Terence); Modified text on 3/28/2023 (ztth).
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelly D. Hine, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9951592. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAX LTD. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ross, Terence)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAX LTD. INC. (Ross, Terence)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9949908) filed by JAX LTD. INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Ross, Terence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAX LTD. INC. v. SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAX LTD. INC.
Represented By: Terence Patrick Ross
Represented By: Kelly D. Hine
Represented By: Julia Mazur
Represented By: Sean S. Wooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS, NSD HOLDING 2021 APS,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKOLAI SCHULTZ DIRKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSD HOLDING 2021 APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHULTZ DEVELOPMENT APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKOLAI SCHULTZ DIRKS HASAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?