GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC v. LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC
Plaintiff: GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC
Defendant: THE LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC and LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00795
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Amended Verified Complaint against LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC filed by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC.(Hagerty, Richard)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2023. (nbn)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION re. #11 Order on Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/15/2023. (lcjeb1)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; and 2) As discussed at the hearing on May 15, 2023, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by May 30, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/15/2023. (lcjeb1)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 5/15/2023 re #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver - Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC. Amended Complaint due by 5/30/2023. (Court Reporter Liz Saint-Loth) (nbn)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY re #9 Response to motion, Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction filed by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC. (Hagerty, Richard)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's Reply in support of the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is due by May 8, 2023; and 2) A videoconference hearing on the Motion is set for May 15, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/2023. (lcjeb1)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2023 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver - Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC. (Stern, Richard)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC.(Stern, Richard)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Initial Pleadings by LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stern, Richard)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent #7 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint and Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction by April 25, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/19/2023. (lcjeb1)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/25/2023. (nbn)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023 (Hagerty, Richard)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE in Compliance with Minute Order Assuring Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC re Order, (Hagerty, Richard)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice due by 3/28/2023. (znbn)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THE LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver - Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagerty, Richard). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 3/27/2023 (znmw).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC (Hagerty, Richard)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint for Appointment of a Receiver, Injunctive and Other Relief against THE LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9951481) filed by GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Hagerty, Richard)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmrl)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: To assure itself of its subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall submit a Notice by March 28, 2023, that sets forth each of its LLC members and their states of citizenship. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/24/2023. (lcjeb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC v. LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENESIS CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURAVIN LUXURY APARTMENTS HOMES, LLC
Represented By: Richard Steven Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?