KIM et al v. DP CAPITAL LLC et al
Plaintiff: EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC and KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.
Defendant: DP CAPITAL LLC., WCP FUND I LLC., WCP 4910 GEORGIA AVE NW LLC., 4910 GEORGIA AVE HOLDINGS LLC., COLOMA RIVER HOLDINGS LLC., CHARLES P. PARET, MEL MELAKU NEGUSSIE, DISTRICT TITLE, DP CAPITAL LLC. doing business as WASHINGTON CAPITAL PARTNERS and COLOMA RIVER CAPITAL
Case Number: 1:2023cv01101
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file any response to District Title's #20 Motion to Dismiss by July 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/15/2023. (lctjk3)
June 14, 2023 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zablah-Siman, Federico)
June 12, 2023 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zablah-Siman, Federico)
June 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DISTRICT TITLE. Attorney Lindsay Powell terminated. (Powell, Lindsay)
June 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by DISTRICT TITLE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Justin)
June 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Flint on behalf of DISTRICT TITLE (Flint, Justin)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Mel Melaku Negussie's #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Defendant Mel Melaku Negussie's #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and Plaintiffs' consent to the relief sought, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant Negussie shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint by June 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/31/2023. (lctjk3)
May 30, 2023 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MEL MELAKU NEGUSSIE. (Sadowski, James)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant District Title Corp.'s #17 Consent Motion to Vacate Entry of Default. Upon consideration of District Title Corp.'s #17 Consent Motion to Vacate Entry of Default, and Plaintiffs' consent to the relief sought, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The #16 Clerk's Entry of Default as to District Title is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that District Title Corp. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by June 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/23/2023. (lctjk3)
May 22, 2023 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Vacate #16 Clerk's Entry of Default by DISTRICT TITLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Lindsay)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file any response to the WCP Parties' #6 Motion to Dismiss by June 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/19/2023. (lctjk3)
May 18, 2023 Filing 16 VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 5/23/2023.....Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DISTRICT TITLE. (ztth); Modified on 5/24/2023 (ztth).
May 18, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Motion to Dismiss by EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zablah-Siman, Federico)
May 17, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #11 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed, #12 Summons Returned Executed, #13 Summons Returned Executed. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE. In the future, do not select All Plaintiffs radio button - select individual party served and date of delivery. (ztth)
May 16, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against District Title by EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.. (Zablah-Siman, Federico)
May 16, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WCP FUND I LLC. served on 4/24/2023 (Petersen, J.); Modified on 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WCP 4910 GEORGIA AVE NW LLC. served on 4/24/2023. (Petersen, J.) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MEL MELAKU NEGUSSIE served on 4/24/2023. (Petersen, J.) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DP CAPITAL LLC. served on 4/24/2023. (Petersen, J.) Modified texton 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT TITLE served on 4/24/2023 (Petersen, J.) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 4910 GEORGIA AVE HOLDINGS LLC. served on 4/24/2023. (Petersen, J.) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (ztth).
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/16/2023. (lctjk3)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by DP CAPITAL LLC., WCP 4910 GEORGIA AVE NW LLC., WCP FUND I LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(VerStandig, Maurice)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Federico Jose Zablah-Siman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zablah-Siman, Federico)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
April 21, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zcb)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 ERRATA to Complaint by EUNG KWON KIM, KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC re #1 Complaint,,. (Petersen, J.)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-1102. (Petersen, J.)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10013043) filed by KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC, Eung Kwon Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(Petersen, J.)
April 20, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jcp@petersenfirm.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIM et al v. DP CAPITAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUNG KWON KIM
Represented By: J. Chapman Petersen
Represented By: Federico Jose Zablah-Siman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC
Represented By: J. Chapman Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM GEORGIA AVE, LLC.
Represented By: Federico Jose Zablah-Siman
Represented By: J. Chapman Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DP CAPITAL LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCP FUND I LLC.
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCP 4910 GEORGIA AVE NW LLC.
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4910 GEORGIA AVE HOLDINGS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOMA RIVER HOLDINGS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES P. PARET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEL MELAKU NEGUSSIE
Represented By: James Donald Sadowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT TITLE
Represented By: Justin M. Flint
Represented By: Lindsay Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DP CAPITAL LLC. doing business as WASHINGTON CAPITAL PARTNERS
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOMA RIVER CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?