Breathe DC v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: BREATHE DC
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01970
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03717. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2023 Filing 34 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER as to CAND 3:20-cv-03717. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the action(s) on this conditional remand order be remanded to its/their respective transferor court(s). Signed by MDL Panel on 6/23/2023. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 23, 2023 MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the JPML Conditional Remand Order of 6/23/2023 in the MDL 2913 master file (dkt. #4053), civil case no. 3:20-cv-03717 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Remark: Notified IT of remand (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AND SUGGSTION OF REMAND by Judge William H. Orrick re 27 Motion to Lift Stay. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Filing 32 Letter from Kim E. Richman, on behalf of Breathe DC . (Richman, Kim) (Filed on 5/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
February 14, 2023 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 09:30 AM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY (re 27 MOTION to Lift Stay re 23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case and Motion to Remand, Or In The Alternative, To Intervene In Proposed Class Settlement ) filed byBreathe DC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Wicklund, Petra) (Filed on 2/10/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 27 MOTION to Lift Stay re 23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case and Motion to Remand, Or In The Alternative, To Intervene In Proposed Class Settlement ) filed by Juul Labs Inc.. (Smith, Renee) (Filed on 2/3/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Deadlines as to 27 MOTION to Lift Stay. Responses due by 2/3/2023. Replies due by 2/10/2023. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 09:30 AM via Videoconference (to coincide with Case Management Conference). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Lift Stay re 23 Order on Motion to Transfer Case and Motion to Remand, Or In The Alternative, To Intervene In Proposed Class Settlement filed by Breathe DC. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/20/2023. Replies due by 1/27/2023. (Wicklund, Petra) (Filed on 1/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Petra Renee Wicklund (Wicklund, Petra) (Filed on 1/18/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
August 4, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Clark A. Binkley by Kim E. Richman (Richman, Kim) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 24 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/19/2021, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1444 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (1442 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (1443 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FURTHER STAYING DETERMINATION ON 22 MOTION by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Retransfer to District Court for the District Court of Columbia filed by Breathe DC. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim E. Richman, # 2 Exhibit A-J to Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Retransfer)(Richman, Kim) (Filed on 1/29/2021) Modified on 1/29/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Clark Binkley requesting clarification. (Binkley, Clark) (Filed on 7/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Clark A. Binkley. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14596786.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/18/2020 filed by Breathe DC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Binkley, Clark) (Filed on 6/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00619. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 5, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:19-md-02913-WHO; District of Columbia, 1:20-cv-00619-TFH Breathe DC v. Juul Labs, Inc., opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-03717 WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 642 6/2/20 cc: JPMDL (gbaS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 EMAIL dated 6/2/2020 from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 6/2/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge William H. Orrick III for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2913) (ztnr) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by BREATHE DC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply)(Richman, Kim) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer filed by JUUL LABS, INC.. (Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by BREATHE DC. (Richman, Kim) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer filed by BREATHE DC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kim Richman, # 2 Exhibit Motion to Vacate)(Richman, Kim) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the defendant's 9 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to remand shall be held in abeyance pending the Court's resolution of the motion to stay. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 28, 2020. (JK) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JUUL LABS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by JUUL LABS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer by JUUL LABS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by BREATHE DC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and for Fees and Costs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order to Grant Motion to Remand and for Fees and Costs)(Richman, Kim).Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 3/12/2020 (eg). Modified on 3/13/2020 (eg). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the pending 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, it is ordered that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed within 30 days after the date on which the plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand is decided or, in the event no such motion is filed, within 30 days after the date on which the plaintiff's motion to remand was due. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 6, 2020. (JK) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by JUUL LABS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Farrell on behalf of JUUL LABS, INC. (Farrell, Peter) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re 1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (adh, ) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUUL LABS, INC. (Trout Perez, Tia) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tia T. Trout Perez on behalf of JUUL LABS, INC. (Trout Perez, Tia) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUUL LABS, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00057 (W.D. Texas); 2:20-cv-00343 and 2:20-cv-00402 (E.D. Pennsylvania); 19-md-02913 (N.D. California). (Trout Perez, Tia) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 000426 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6880952 filed by JUUL LABS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Superior Court Documents Documents from Superior Court, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trout Perez, Tia) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breathe DC v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREATHE DC
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Represented By: Peter A. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?