RUHOSHA v. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: JEAN PAUL RUHOSHA
Defendant: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER and MEDSTAR GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2023cv02218
Filed: August 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Jia M Cobb
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2023. (zgf)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Reconsideration: The Court construes this motion as a MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Given the representations in the motion, the Court GRANTS the request and will give Plaintiff 30 days to refile the Complaint. The Court instructs Plaintiff that the Complaint needs to clearly identify the grounds for the courts jurisdiction, the legal claims alleged, and the relief sought. The submission is due October 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 8, 2023. (lcjmc3) Modified on 9/11/2023, to correct a Chambers error. (zgf).
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Review a Court Order re #3 Order, Memorandum & Opinion, #4 Order by JEAN PAUL RUHOSHA. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachments)(ztth)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint and this action sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 9, 2023. (lcjmc3)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 9, 2023. (lcjmc3)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by JEAN PAUL RUHOSHA (mg)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, MEDSTAR GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 205224) with Jury Demand filed by JEAN PAUL RUHOSHA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Summons (2) Issued as to MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, MEDSTAR GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUHOSHA v. MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN PAUL RUHOSHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSTAR GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?