CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE et al v. W P CO LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE, TRIALSITE INC, CREATIVE DESTRUCTION MEDIA INC, ERIN ELIZABETH FINN, JIM HOFT, BEN TAPPER, BEN SWANN, Dr. JOSEPH MERCOLA, TY BOLLINGER, CHARLENE BOLLINGER and JEFF CROUERE
Defendant: W P CO doing business as WASHINGTON POST, BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP, ASSOCIATED PRESS and REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC.
Petitioner: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Case Number: 1:2023cv02735
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Street on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Street, Scott)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Scott J. Street is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/6/2023. (lctjk1)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott J. Street, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10469691. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHARLENE BOLLINGER, TY BOLLINGER, CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE, CREATIVE DESTRUCTION MEDIA INC, JEFF CROUERE, ERIN ELIZABETH FINN, JIM HOFT, JOSEPH MERCOLA, BEN SWANN, BEN TAPPER, TRIALSITE INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott J. Street, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Richman, Kim)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #90 Joint Motion for Supplemental Briefing Schedule. Upon consideration of the parties' #90 joint motion, it is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file one supplemental brief in support of their #41 motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) by November 23, 2023; Plaintiffs shall file their response by December 21, 2023; and neither party's brief shall exceed fifteen double-spaced pages. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply by January 11, 2024, which shall not exceed five double-spaced pages. Finally, it is further ORDERED, with the consent of the parties, that Defendant BBC's #39 Rule 12(b)(2) motion as well as Plaintiffs' #54 alternative motion for judicial discovery are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/2/2023. (lctjk1)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Supplemental) by CHARLENE BOLLINGER, TY BOLLINGER, CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE, CREATIVE DESTRUCTION MEDIA INC, JEFF CROUERE, ERIN ELIZABETH FINN, JIM HOFT, JOSEPH MERCOLA, BEN SWANN, BEN TAPPER, TRIALSITE INC. (Richman, Kim)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Smith on behalf of REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC. (Smith, Allison)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Reuters News & Media Inc.'s #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Allison B. Smith is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/24/2023. (lctjk1)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allison B. Smith, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10438431. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Allison B. Smith, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bank, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bank on behalf of REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC. (Bank, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Schwartz on behalf of BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP (Schwartz, Edward)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Richman on behalf of CHARLENE BOLLINGER, TY BOLLINGER, CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE, CREATIVE DESTRUCTION MEDIA INC, JEFF CROUERE, ERIN ELIZABETH FINN, JIM HOFT, JOSEPH MERCOLA, BEN SWANN, BEN TAPPER, TRIALSITE INC (Richman, Kim)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Goodman Hentoff on behalf of W P CO (Hentoff, Thomas)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Weissert on behalf of ASSOCIATED PRESS (Weissert, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie John on behalf of ASSOCIATED PRESS (John, Leslie)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth P. Weissert, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10396660. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elizabeth P. Weissert Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania)(Brown, Jay)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leslie E. John, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10396634. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Leslie E. John Declaration, #2 Exhibit Leslie E. John Certificate of Good Standing - PA)(Brown, Jay)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant The Associated Press's #80 , #81 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Leslie E. John and Elizabeth P. Weissert are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/3/2023. (lctjk1)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/20/2023. (lctjk1)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:23-cv-00720. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #42 Motion to Transfer Case as to the request to transfer the case to the District of Columbia. It is denied as to the request to transfer the case to the Southern District of New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this proceeding be transferred to the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/18/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (aty,Maturin, Glynn) Modified on 9/18/2023 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for Discovery , #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE re #62 Amicus Curiae Brief by Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co.(crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/12/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Response to #62 Amicus Curiae Brief with opposition by Associated Press, W P Co, Reuters News & Media Inc, British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Mince, Loretta) Modified on 9/11/2023 to add filers, create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #71 MOTION for Leave to File Response to #62 Amicus Curiae Brief with opposition. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ENTRY: Sur-Reply briefs as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed and #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co, Associated Press are due due by 9/15/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/7/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #54 MOTION for Discovery filed by British Broadcasting Corp. (aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #65 Motion to Strike Exhibits [57-1] & [57-2] attached to #57 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/6/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #64 Motion to Strike Exhibits [59-1], [59-2] & [59-3] attached to #59 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue; granting #64 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply brief. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/6/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ISSUED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #64 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [59-1], [59-2] & [59-3] to #59 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Leave to File with opposition , #65 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [57-1] & [57-2] to #57 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction MOTION for Leave to File with opposition . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 9/27/2023 (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 9/6/2023 to indicate issued in error. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #66 Notice of Motion Setting,,. Action taken: Modified docket text to indicate #66 Notice of Motion Setting issued in error. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [59-1], [59-2] & [59-3] to #59 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Leave to File with opposition , #65 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [57-1] & [57-2] to #57 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction MOTION for Leave to File with opposition . Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/5/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [57-1] & [57-2] to #57 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Alternatively, MOTION for Leave to File Surreply with opposition (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/5/2023.) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) Modified on 9/6/2023 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Strike Exhibits [59-1], [59-2] & [59-3] to #59 Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue, Alternatively MOTION for Leave to File Surreply with opposition (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/5/2023.) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) Modified on 9/6/2023 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Roger Ian Teich for Childrens Health Defense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/31/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support by State of Louisiana re #1 Complaint. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae of the State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/30/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co. (aty,Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Associated Press, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,Schmidtlein, John)[Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Roger Ian Teich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5673635) by Childrens Health Defense. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by British Broadcasting Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Loweth, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Olbrantz)(aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of the Plaintiffs with opposition by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Tracy L Short added to party State of Louisiana(pty:am))(aty,Short, Tracy) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #56 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of the Plaintiffs with opposition . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #54 MOTION for Discovery . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 9/6/2023 (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Discovery by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. (aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward B Schwartz for British Broadcasting Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/17/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michelle A Mantine for British Broadcasting Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/17/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Casey J Olbrantz for British Broadcasting Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/17/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Michelle A. Mantine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5621131) by British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Edward B. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5621129) by British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Casey J. Olbrantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5621126) by British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel William Pennington Gibbens for Reuters News & Media Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/12/2023. (crt,Alexander, E) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #41 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #42 MOTION to Transfer Case , #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 8/15/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action to Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co regarding #40 Notice of Motion Setting,. Action taken: Terminated #40 Notice of Motion Setting. #43 Amended Notice of Motion Setting issued. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Transfer Case by Associated Press, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of The Associated Press, Reuters News & Media, Inc., and WP Company LLC's Motion To Transfer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #39 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 8/1/2023 (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/12/2023 to indicate #43 Amended Notice of Motion Setting issued. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiciton by British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit )(aty,Christiansen, Jan) Modified on 7/11/2023 to modify motion event and docket text.(Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Allison B Smith for Reuters News & Media Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/11/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jeffrey C Bank for Reuters News & Media Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/11/2023. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reuters News & Media Inc identifying Corporate Parents, Thomson Reuters U S L L C, Thomson Reuters Corp for Reuters News & Media Inc. (aty,McEachin, Thomas) Modified on 7/11/2023 to add corporate parent and modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for William P. Gibbens to Enroll as Counsel by Reuters News & Media Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McEachin, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Elizabeth P Weissert for Associated Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/10/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jay Ward Brown for Associated Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/10/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Leslie E John for Associated Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/10/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5616381) by Reuters News & Media Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,McEachin, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Jeffrey C. Bank to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5616312) by Reuters News & Media Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(Attorney Thomas M McEachin added to party Reuters News & Media Inc(pty:dft))(aty,McEachin, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Weissert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5614699) by Associated Press. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit 1_Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Mince, Loretta) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Jay Ward Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5614661) by Associated Press. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit 1_Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Mince, Loretta) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leslie Ellen John to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5614048) by Associated Press. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing Leslie Ellen John)(aty,Mince, Loretta) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
July 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by British Broadcasting Corp. (aty,Christiansen, Jan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kathryn E Garza for W P Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/26/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Thomas G Hentoff for W P Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/26/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nicholas G Gamse for W P Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/26/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John E Schmidtlein for W P Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/26/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Kathryn E. Garza to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5601951) by W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Johnson, Bernard) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5601942) by W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Johnson, Bernard) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Nicholas G. Gamse to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5601930) by W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Johnson, Bernard) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5601313) by W P Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Johnson, Bernard) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Joint Briefing Schedule. Deadline of 7/11/23 to answer or file motion to dismiss or other pre-answer responsive motion. Plaintiff to oppose by 8/15/23. Defendants to file replies by 8/29/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/22/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Associated Press. (aty,Mince, Loretta) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Per #17 Order, Set Deadlines as to any pre-answer responsive motions filed Responses due by 8/15/2023; Replies due by 8/29/2023. (crt,Leday, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply sent to Loretta G Mince on behalf of Associated Press. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/5/2023. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply sent to Jan P Christiansen on behalf of British Broadcasting Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/5/2023. (crt,Crick, S)[Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W P Co. (aty,Johnson, Bernard) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent and for Joint Briefing Schedule by W P Co, Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Bernard S Johnson added to party W P Co(pty:dft))(aty,Johnson, Bernard) Modified on 6/21/23 to add filers. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jed Rubenfeld for Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/16/2023. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John W Howard for Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/16/2023. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Scott J Street for Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Jim Hoft, Joseph Mercola, Ben Swann, Ben Tapper, Trialsite Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/16/2023. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Jed Rubenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5589626) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for John W. Howard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5589611) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Scott J. Street to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5589576) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charlene Bollinger, Ty Bollinger, Childrens Health Defense, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Jeff Crouere, Erin Elizabeth Finn re #3 Summons Issued - All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ben Tapper, Jeff Crouere, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Ben Swann, Ty Bollinger, Trialsite Inc, Joseph Mercola, Childrens Health Defense, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Charlene Bollinger, Jim Hoft. Associated Press served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; British Broadcasting Corp served on 6/5/2023, answer due 6/26/2023; Reuters News & Media Inc served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; W P Co served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as #5 Certificate of Service. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Donald E Walter no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to All Defendants, submitted by Ben Tapper, Jeff Crouere, Creative Destruction Media, Inc., Ben Swann, Ty Bollinger, Trialsite, Inc., Joseph Mercola, Childrens Health Defense, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Charlene Bollinger, Jim Hoft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons/writ, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ)(aty,Maturin, Glynn) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associated Press, British Broadcasting Corp, Reuters News & Media Inc, W P Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5575932) filed by Ben Tapper, Jeff Crouere, Creative Destruction Media Inc, Ben Swann, Ty Bollinger, Trialsite Inc, Joseph Mercola, Childrens Health Defense, Erin Elizabeth Finn, Charlene Bollinger, Jim Hoft. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit LR 3.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statements)(Attorney Glynn Shelly Maturin, II added to party Charlene Bollinger(pty:pla), Ty Bollinger(pty:pla), Childrens Health Defense(pty:pla), Creative Destruction Media Inc(pty:pla), Jeff Crouere(pty:pla), Erin Elizabeth Finn(pty:pla), Jim Hoft(pty:pla), Joseph Mercola(pty:pla), Ben Swann(pty:pla), Ben Tapper(pty:pla), Trialsite Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Maturin, Glynn) Modified on 6/1/2023 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE et al v. W P CO LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHILDRENS HEALTH DEFENSE
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIALSITE INC
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREATIVE DESTRUCTION MEDIA INC
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN ELIZABETH FINN
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM HOFT
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEN TAPPER
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEN SWANN
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. JOSEPH MERCOLA
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TY BOLLINGER
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE BOLLINGER
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF CROUERE
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Scott J. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W P CO doing business as WASHINGTON POST
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Nicholas G. Gamse
Represented By: Thomas Goodman Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP
Represented By: Edward B. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Represented By: Elizabeth Weissert
Represented By: Leslie John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Bank
Represented By: Allison Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?