GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. v. PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA
Petitioner: GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.
Respondent: PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA
Intervenor: IAReporter, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03031
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0202 Award under Convention on Foreign Arbitral Awards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 Letters Rogatory Issued (lsj)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/1/2023. (lsj)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court shall affix the Court's signature and seal to the forms USM-272 (Exhibit A to Motion) and USM-272A (Exhibit B to Motion) on pages 2 and 5, in the locations designated for "Signature and stamp of the judicial or other adjudicatory authority of the State of origin" for Exhibit A and "Firma y sello del organo jurisdiccional requirente" for Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/1/2023. (lccrc1) Modified on 12/1/2023 (zlsj).
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Service under the Inter-American Convention on Letters Rogatory and Additional Protocol by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 12/7/2023 (zlsj).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Motion to Redact. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/28/2023. (lccrc1)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by IAReporter, LLC re #8 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal Document #1 Petition to Enforce Arbitration Award, filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (Russell, Lauren)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 ERRATA by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. re #14 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Elliot)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED / PETITION TO ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas W. Walsh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Elliot) Modified event on 11/20/2023; pursuant to Counsel (mg).
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Elliot)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal Document #1 Petition to Enforce Arbitration Award, filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. filed by IAReporter, LLC. (Russell, Lauren)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 Motion to Intervene,, Motion to Unseal Document, filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Unseal, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Redact)(Walsh, Thomas)
October 30, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Walsh on behalf of GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (Walsh, Thomas)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IAReporter, LLC (Russell, Lauren)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 11/22/2023.....MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Unseal Document #1 Petition to Enforce Arbitration Award, filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. by IAReporter, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Lauren) Modified on 11/22/2023 (zjm).
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order MINTUTE ORDER granting #3 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. It is hereby ordered that Petitioner be provisionally permitted to file Exhibit A under seal. Petitioner is directed to confer with counsel for the Respondent concerning the scope of any subsequent unsealing and to file a motion to unseal, with Respondents consent or otherwise, within 14 days after counsel for Respondent enters an appearance in this case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/18/2023. (lccrc1)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Montiel on behalf of GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (Montiel, Ruth)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ruth A. Montiel. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2023. (lccrc1)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Thomas W. Walsh. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2023. (lccrc1)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
October 12, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ruth A. Montiel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10413535. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ruth A. Montiel, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Elliot)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas W. Walsh, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10413532. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas W. Walsh, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Elliot)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order To Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order To Redact)(Friedman, Elliot)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. (Friedman, Elliot)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION TO ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10413522.) filed by GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas W. Walsh, #2 Exhibit A (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Friedman, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD. v. PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GLENCORE FINANCE (BERMUDA) LTD.
Represented By: Elliot Friedman
Represented By: Ruth Montiel
Represented By: Thomas W. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PLURINATIONAL STATE OF BOLIVIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: IAReporter, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?