WILSON v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: ZENOBIA-DENELLE WILSON
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, U.S. BANCORP, LASALLE BANK, BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACK SECURITIES 1 TRUST 2007-HE3, SAMUEL I. WHITE, RUSSELL RICHARDSON and SUPERIOR COURT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CIVIL DIVISION LANDLORD AND TENANT BRANCH
Case Number: 1:2023cv03058
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall file its responsive pleading and opposition on or before December 20, 2023. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 6, 2023. (lcdlf3)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition and Responsive pleadings due by 12/20/2023 (zjch, )
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Stay by BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACK SECURITIES 1 TRUST 2007-HE3, LASALLE BANK, U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glass, Daniel)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 19, 2023. (lcdlf3)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff has filed a #3 Motion to Stay, which appears to request that the Court stay a judgment of the D.C. Superior Court, see Compl., Dkt. 1. But it is unclear whether this Court has jurisdiction over this matter, and the Court will not consider the #3 Motion to Stay until the defendants have been served with the #1 Complaint and the #3 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), the Court directs the plaintiff to promptly serve the defendants on or before January 11, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 19, 2023. (lcdlf3)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Stay by ZENOBIA-DENELLE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(mg)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 205766) filed by ZENOBIA-DENELLE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Summons (7) Issued as to All Defendants. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZENOBIA-DENELLE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Daniel A. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANCORP
Represented By: Daniel A. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASALLE BANK
Represented By: Daniel A. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACK SECURITIES 1 TRUST 2007-HE3
Represented By: Daniel A. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL I. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR COURT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CIVIL DIVISION LANDLORD AND TENANT BRANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?