ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM et al v. HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC. and LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, CAROLE JOHNSON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 1:2023cv03252
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC. re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Paul)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Albert Declaration, #3 Declaration Lee Declaration, #4 Declaration Gelejian Declaration, #5 Declaration Hughes Declaration, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul)
December 22, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven J. Schnelle, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10577829. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven J. Schnelle, #2 Exhibit Steven J. Schelle Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Emily J. Cook is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/22/23. (lcapm2)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. To cure the application, the movant must submit a certificate of good standing, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing. See LCvR 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/22/23. (lcapm2)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily J. Cook, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10515283. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of E. Cook, #2 Exhibit E. Cook Certificate of Good Standing)(Hughes, Paul)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2024. (Hughes, Paul)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Seidell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Seidell, Charles)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zdp)
November 1, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zdp)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC., BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, KECK MEDICINE OF USC, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC. (Hughes, Paul)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10461112) filed by THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL, BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH, KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC., PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS, BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE, NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY, HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS, YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC., KECK MEDICINE OF USC, BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons to Health Resources and Services Administration, #8 Summons Summons to Carole Johnson, #9 Summons Summons to Department of Health and Human Services, #10 Summons Summons to Xavier Becerra, #11 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #12 Summons Summons to United States Attorney's Office)(Hughes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM et al v. HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBANY MED HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONSON HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONSON LAKEVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONSON METHODIST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONSON BATTLE CREEK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS & CHICAGO HEIGHTS
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH LAFAYETTE
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH DYER
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER, INC. d.b.a. FRANCISCAN HEALTH RENSSELAER
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KECK MEDICINE OF USC
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KECK MEDICAL CENTER OF USC
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USC ARCADIA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HEALTH
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATION d.b.a. MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER - ALBANY
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSAIC MEDICAL CENTER MARYVILLE
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER d.b.a. MOSAIC LIFE CARE
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY WEST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL d.b.a. NORTHWESTERN MEDICINE VALLEY WEST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM d.b.a. PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LANCASTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HEALTH CARE TRI-VALLEY
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL SYSTEM
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN CAMPUS
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND MEDICAL CENTER MIDTOWN CAMPUS
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND REHABILITATION AND ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND CAPITAL REGION HEALTH
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND SHORE REGIONAL HEALTH
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YALE NEW HAVEN HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGEPORT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YALE NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE + MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes, III
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?