ETHERIDGE v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Plaintiff: CARISA ETHERIDGE
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI SA, AVENTIS PHARMA S.A., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03258
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott McRae on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (McRae, Christopher)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Harley Ratliff on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Ratliff, Harley) Modified on 12/19/2023, pursuant to Counsel (mg).
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by January 9, 2024, updating the Court on how they wish to proceed in this matter, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/12/2023. (lctjk2)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' #15 Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Christopher S. McRae is hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/21/2023. (lctjk2)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher S. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10507355. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI SA, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration Declaration)(Houston, Olivia)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' #13 #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) requires that a motion seeking leave to appear pro hac vice "must be accompanied by a certificate of the court or bar for the state in which the applicant regularly practices, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court." Attorney Christopher S. McRae has not provided these certificates in either motion. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the #13 #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/20/2023. (lctjk2)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher S. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10505020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI SA, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Houston, Olivia)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher R. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10500875. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI SA, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayne, Charles)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/16/2023. (lctjk2)
November 16, 2023 NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 11/23/2023. (zmrl)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of All Defendants (Wayne, Charles)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of All Defendants (Houston, Olivia)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-09431. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6373471) filed by Carisa Etheridge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney C. Brannon Robertson added to party Carisa Etheridge(pty:pla).(Robertson, C. Brannon) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/3/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETHERIDGE v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI SA
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARISA ETHERIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?