LEE v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC., et al
Plaintiff: ODELL LEE
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., INC. and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03353
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #19 Joint Status Report, Plaintiff shall file any motion seeking consolidation and/or leave to file an amended Complaint by January 12, 2024. Defendants' opposition shall be due by January 26. And Plaintiff's reply shall be due by February 2. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/21/2023. (lctnm1)
December 20, 2023 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (McRae, Christopher)
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott McRae on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (McRae, Christopher)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Harley Ratliff on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Ratliff, Harley)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report by December 20, 2023, apprising the Court of any remaining issues in this matter. And, if necessary, the parties should jointly propose a briefing schedule designed to address those remaining issues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/08/2023. (lctnm1)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Harley V. Ratliff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10515168. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Houston, Olivia)
November 22, 2023 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Harley V. Ratliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. (lctnm1)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher S. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10507409. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Houston, Olivia)
November 20, 2023 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Amended Motion for Christopher S. McRae to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. (lctnm1)
November 18, 2023 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #14 Motion for Christopher S. McRae to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. (lctnm1)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher S. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10505057. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Houston, Olivia)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher S. McRae, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10500919. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayne, Charles)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court DENIES Defendant's #13 Motion for Christopher S. McRae to Appear Pro Hac Vice. His sponsoring attorney, Charles B. Wayne, is "currently not in good standing to file in this court." Notice (Nov. 16, 2023). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2023. (lctnm1)
November 16, 2023 RESOLVED NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles), #11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of All Defendants (Wayne, Charles).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 11/23/2023. (zmrl) Modified on 1/3/2024 (zmrl).
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of All Defendants (Wayne, Charles)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of All Defendants (Houston, Olivia)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/14/2023. (lctnm1)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01786. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6671154) filed by Odell Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Darin Lee Schanker added to party Odell Lee(pty:pla).(Schanker, Darin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/1/2018) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/1/2018) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/1/2018) (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/9/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ODELL LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?