HARGROVE v. MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: SHANA HARGROVE
Defendant: Medstar Washington Hospital Center, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI, M.D., MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, M.D., KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, M.D., STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN and KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY
Case Number: 1:2023cv03381
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of the Amended Complaint by KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Halaiko, Michael)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint Count 1 by MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER.(Halaiko, Michael)
January 5, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint Count 1 by KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI.(Halaiko, Michael)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss Count II and plaintiff's #16 Response, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on December 22, 2023, which is now the operative complaint. Accordingly, the request to dismiss Count II of the original complaint is moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/2/2024. (lcrjl1)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count II filed by SHANA HARGROVE. (Parker, Kim)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI with Jury Demand filed by SHANA HARGROVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint)(Parker, Kim)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER (Halaiko, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Jurisdiction Cases by MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER (Halaiko, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE Adopting Motion to Dismiss Count 2 by MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER re #7 Motion to Dismiss (Halaiko, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Count 1 by MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER.(Halaiko, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Halaiko on behalf of MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER (Halaiko, Michael)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/12/2023. (lcrjl1)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Jurisdiction Cases by KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI (Halaiko, Michael)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count II by KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Halaiko, Michael)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Halaiko on behalf of KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI (Halaiko, Michael)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI.(Halaiko, Michael)
December 9, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023; MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023; STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023 (Parker, Kim)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Parker on behalf of SHANA HARGROVE (Parker, Kim)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
November 13, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zljn)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10486844) filed by SHANA HARGROVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Medstar, #3 Summons STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI, MD (Individual), #4 Summons STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI, MD. (Professional Capacity), #5 Summons MAXWELL A. HOCKSTEIN, M.D. (Individual Capacity), #6 Summons MAXWELL A. HOCKSTEIN, M.D.(Professional Capacity), #7 Summons KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, M.D. (Individual Capacity), #8 Summons KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, M.D. (Professional Capacity))(Parker, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARGROVE v. MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANA HARGROVE
Represented By: Kim Parker
Represented By: Governor Eugene Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medstar Washington Hospital Center
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MATTHEW LUCZYCKI
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXWELL A HOCKSTEIN
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITLYN MARIE DUNPHY
Represented By: Michael J. Halaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?