META PLATFORMS, INC. v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al
Plaintiff: META PLATFORMS, INC.
Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER and ALVARO BEDOYA
Case Number: 1:2023cv03562
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's calendar and the FTC's order extending Meta's deadline to respond in the administrative proceeding to March 15, 2024, see Dkt. 22-1, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions hearing scheduled for January 29, 2024 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for March 1, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/27/2024. (lcrdm1)
January 25, 2024 Filing 24 SURREPLY to re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Rouhandeh, James)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply, Dkt. #23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant may file a response not to exceed five pages on or before February 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/25/2024. (lcrdm1)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Surreply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rouhandeh, James)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Liao, Cynthia)
December 27, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rouhandeh, James)
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Rouhandeh, James)
December 14, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to cynthia.f.liao@usdoj.gov, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Notice of Corrected Docket Entry: Your entry has been modified as a courtesy. Please note the appropriate reminders for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document, 3. Counsel is reminded for two-part documents; second docket entry is required. (zjm, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER. (See Docket Entry #18 to view document) (zjm)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Liao, Cynthia) Modified on 12/14/2023 to correct docket text (zjm).
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 ERRATA by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #14 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Rebecca K. Slaughter, #2 Affidavit of Service of Lina M. Khan, #3 Affidavit of Service of Alvaro Bedoya)(Rouhandeh, James)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 ERRATA by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #13 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (Rouhandeh, James)
December 8, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Scheduling Conference held on 12/8/2023. The parties Proposed Schedule is GRANTED. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Motion #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALVARO BEDOYA, LINA M. KHAN, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER - DENIED AS MOOT. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/5/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2024. (Rouhandeh, James)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALVARO BEDOYA served on 12/7/2023; FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION served on 12/7/2023; LINA M. KHAN served on 12/7/2023; REBECCA K SLAUGHTER served on 12/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Rebecca K. Slaughter, #2 Affidavit of Service of Lina M. Khan, #3 Affidavit of Service of Alvaro Bedoya)(Rouhandeh, James)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/07/2023. (Rouhandeh, James)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Rouhandeh, James)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Liao, Cynthia)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) Modified on 12/5/2023 to correct docket text (zjm).
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Liao on behalf of All Defendants (Liao, Cynthia)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Rouhandeh, James)
December 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Meta's motion for a preliminary injunction, Dkt. #4 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a Scheduling Conference on that motion on December 8, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before December 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/2023. (lcrdm1)
December 4, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to rouhandeh@davispolk.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Nathanson on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Nathanson, Paul)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stuart Scheinkman on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Scheinkman, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of James P. Rouhandeh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rouhandeh, James)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by META PLATFORMS, INC. (Rouhandeh, James)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Rouhandeh on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Rouhandeh, James)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against ALVARO BEDOYA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN, REBECCA K SLAUGHTER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10526458) filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rouhandeh, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: META PLATFORMS, INC. v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: META PLATFORMS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Stuart Scheinkman
Represented By: Paul Nathanson
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Cynthia Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINA M. KHAN
Represented By: Cynthia Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA K SLAUGHTER
Represented By: Cynthia Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVARO BEDOYA
Represented By: Cynthia Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?